KEMP v. HOFFMAN et al
Plaintiff: CHERRI KEMP
Defendant: KAYLA HOFFMAN, WALNUT STREET LESSEE L.P. D/B/A THE RADIAN, WALNUT STREET LESSEE L.P. and WALNUT STREET GP LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv03447
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Videoconference (Attachments: #1 consent form)(ig, )
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Phila. County. (kw, )
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by WALNUT STREET GP LLC, WALNUT STREET LESSEE L.P., WALNUT STREET LESSEE L.P. D/B/A THE RADIAN.(MCNULTY, KEVIN)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt, )
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALNUT STREET LESSEE L.P. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15311073), filed by WALNUT STREET LESSEE L.P..(MCNULTY, KEVIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEMP v. HOFFMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERRI KEMP
Represented By: MARC I. SIMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAYLA HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALNUT STREET LESSEE L.P. D/B/A THE RADIAN
Represented By: KEVIN R. MCNULTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALNUT STREET LESSEE L.P.
Represented By: KEVIN R. MCNULTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALNUT STREET GP LLC
Represented By: KEVIN R. MCNULTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?