BRYANT et al v. ALLIANCE PROPERTY SOLUTIONS et al
Plaintiff: KEVIN BRYANT and SHANICQUA BRYANT
Defendant: ALLIANCE PROPERTY SOLUTIONS and JANSELL ARIAS
Case Number: 2:2021cv03475
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M YOUNGE
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 73 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 10 Plaintiff's response to defendants' motion to lift default judgment, Certificate of Service, filed by PRO SE PLFF KEVIN BRYANT. "NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED" (Attachments: #1 E-mail Attachment)(kw, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO CORRECT/SUBSTITUE EXHIBITS RE #8 First MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by ALLIANCE PROPERTY SOLUTIONS, JANSELL ARIAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(BARENBAUM, EVAN) Modified on 10/1/2021 (tjd). Modified on 10/1/2021 (tjd).
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by ALLIANCE PROPERTY SOLUTIONS, JANSELL ARIAS.Brief, Affidavit. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Affidavit of Jansell Arias)(BARENBAUM, EVAN)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE THAT THIS ORDER IS ENTERED ON THE DOCKET, PLFFS SHALL SHOW CAUSE IN A LETTER BRIEF TO THIS COURT WHICH EXPLAINS THEIR THEORY FOR FEDERAL SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION TO ALLOW THIS COURT TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER THEIR STATE LAW CLAIMS, ETC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSMIT COPIES OF THIS ORDER TO PLFFS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 9/27/21. 9/27/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, filed by PRO SE PLFF KEVIN BRYANT (Attachments: #1 E-mail Attachment)(kw, )
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS JANSELL ARIAS AND ALLIANCE PROPERTY SOLUTIONS, DECLARATION IN SUPPORT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY PRO SE PLFFS KEVIN BRYANT, SHANICQUA BRYANT. (Attachments: #1 E-mail Attachment)(kw, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 Request for DEFAULT AND Default Judgment BY KEVIN BRYANT, SHANICQUA BRYANT against ALLIANCE PROPERTY SOLUTIONS, JANSELL ARIAS, DECLARATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (JL )
September 2, 2021 Default Entered (JL )
September 2, 2021 DEFAULT BY ALLIANCE PROPERTY SOLUTIONS, JANSELL ARIAS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (JL )
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PRO SE PLFF SHANICQUA BRYANT, re: Sam (Last Name), American Courier, served Summons and Complaint upon DEFT JANSELL ARIAS by personal service on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. "NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED" (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 E-Mail Attachment)(kw, )
August 4, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number PPE230406 (sbt, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES. E-Mailed to pro se plffs on 8/5/21. (kw, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALLIANCE PROPERTY SOLUTIONS, JANSELL ARIAS; jury demand. filed by PRO SE PLFFS KEVIN BRYANT, SHANICQUA BRYANT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(kw, ) "NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED" Modified on 8/5/2021 (kw, ). Modified on 8/5/2021 (nd, ).
August 4, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PRO SE PLFFS KEVIN BRYANT, SHANICQUA BRYANT. (kw, )
August 4, 2021 Summons Issued as to ALLIANCE PROPERTY SOLUTIONS, JANSELL ARIAS. E-Mailed To: pro se plffs on 8/5/21 (kw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRYANT et al v. ALLIANCE PROPERTY SOLUTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN BRYANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANICQUA BRYANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIANCE PROPERTY SOLUTIONS
Represented By: EVAN BARENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSELL ARIAS
Represented By: EVAN BARENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?