CHECCHIA v. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Plaintiff: STEVEN CHECCHIA
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2021cv03585
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: R BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF STEVEN CHECCHIA TO FILE A MOTION FOR REMAND PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1447 IS GRANTED; PLAINTIFF'S TIME TO FILE A MOTION FOR REMAND IN THIS ACTION SHALL BE EXTENDED THROUGH AND INCLUDING DECEMBER 13, 2021. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 09/10/2021. 09/13/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2021: #1 STIPULATION) (nd, ).
September 10, 2021 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: MOTIONS DUE BY 12/13/2021. (nd, )
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT BY 12/13/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 9/7/21. (Attachments: #1 STIPULATION) 9/7/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (jaa, )
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE EXTENDED THROUGH & INCLUDING 9/13/2021, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 8/13/21. 8/13/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15331777), filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Preston Taylor, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Designation Form, #5 Case Management Track Form)(SHAW, JARROD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHECCHIA v. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN CHECCHIA
Represented By: KENNETH J. GRUNFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By: JARROD SHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?