STERLING TOWNHOMES LLC v. BERMAN
Plaintiff: STERLING TOWNHOMES LLC
Defendant: COREY M. BERMAN
Case Number: 2:2021cv03586
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 8/27/21. 8/27/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STERLING TOWNHOMES LLC. COREY M. BERMAN waiver sent on 8/16/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (BURKE, MAURA)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW PARK on behalf of COREY M. BERMAN with Certificate of Service(PARK, ANDREW)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by WALTER WEIR, JR on behalf of COREY M. BERMAN with Certificate of Service(WEIR, WALTER)
August 12, 2021 Summons Issued as to COREY M. BERMAN. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/12/21 (bw, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STERLING TOWNHOMES LLC.(BURKE, MAURA)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COREY M. BERMAN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15331892.), filed by STERLING TOWNHOMES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(BURKE, MAURA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STERLING TOWNHOMES LLC v. BERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STERLING TOWNHOMES LLC
Represented By: DAVID M. GILES
Represented By: MAURA L. BURKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COREY M. BERMAN
Represented By: ANDREW PARK
Represented By: WALTER WEIR, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?