JEANJACQUES, ET AL v. AMC ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, INC., ET AL
Plaintiff: Paule Jeanjacques and Mayama Kesselly
Defendant: AMC ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, INC., ABC Corporation I-V and John Does I-V
Case Number: 2:2021cv03670
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Rule 26(f) by AMC ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, INC.. (SHAFIEI, IMMON)
October 14, 2021 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc. with Certificate of Service by AMC ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, INC..(ADAMS, PAUL)
October 14, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by AMC ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, INC..(ADAMS, PAUL)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE VIA TELEPHONE WILL BE HELD ON 10/18/21 AT 8:45 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/30/21. 9/30/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - MEMORANDUM. ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #8 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS WE DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS CLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE BUT REQUIRE DEFENDANTS ANSWER THE REMAINING CLAIMS NO LATER THAN 10/14/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/30/21. 9/30/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 29, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Paule Jeanjacques, Mayama Kesselly. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LADERMAN, MARK)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES' JOINT MOTION #9 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED IN PART AND PLAINTIFFS MAY RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #8 NO LATER THAN 9/29/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/17/21.9/17/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Paule Jeanjacques, Mayama Kesselly..(LADERMAN, MARK)
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by AMC ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, INC..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint)(SHAFIEI, IMMON)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED AND DEFENDANT AMC ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, INC. IS GRANTED LEAVE FOR ONE EXTENSION TO ALLOW FURTHER INVESTIGATION ALLOWING IT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 9/7/21; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/24/21. 8/24/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by AMC ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, INC...(SHAFIEI, IMMON) Modified on 9/2/2021 (lvj, ).
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION IS NOT APPROVED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO BE TIMELY RENEWED WITH A SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE TO AMEND OBLIGATIONS UNDER THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/24/21. 8/24/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by AMC ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, INC..Certificate of Service.(SHAFIEI, IMMON) Modified on 9/2/2021 (lvj, ).
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc. with Certificate of Service by AMC ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, INC..(SHAFIEI, IMMON)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt, )
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMC ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15343388), filed by AMC ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form Designation Form, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A-C to Notice of Removal)(SHAFIEI, IMMON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JEANJACQUES, ET AL v. AMC ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, INC., ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paule Jeanjacques
Represented By: MARK D. LADERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayama Kesselly
Represented By: MARK D. LADERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMC ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: IMMON SHAFIEI
Represented By: PAUL LANCASTER ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporation I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?