BEMCY LLP v. GILEAD SCIENCES INC
Plaintiff: BEMCY LLP
Defendant: GILEAD SCIENCES INC and INITIATIVE MEDIA LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv03734
Filed: August 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BEMCY LLP. GILEAD SCIENCES INC waiver sent on 9/1/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (ARNOLD, JOSEPH)
September 1, 2021 Summons as to amended complaint Issued as to GILEAD SCIENCES INC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/1/21 (bw, ) Modified on 9/1/2021 (bw, ).
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by BEMCY LLP. (ARNOLD, JOSEPH)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BEMCY LLP As To Initiative Media, LLC(ARNOLD, JOSEPH)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GILEAD SCIENCES INC, filed by BEMCY LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sponsorship Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(ARNOLD, JOSEPH)
August 27, 2021 COPY OF DOC. NO. 3 HAS BEEN MAILED TO UNREP. PARTY. (bw, )
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF BEMCY, LLP SHALL, ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 3, 2021, SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS COURT HAS SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION OVER THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 8/25/21. 8/26/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO UNREP. (jaa, )
August 24, 2021 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by BEMCY LLP. *FOR PDF SEE DOC. #2 *(lisad, )
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement by BEMCY LLP. (ARNOLD, JOSEPH)
August 24, 2021 Summons Issued as to GILEAD SCIENCES INC, INITIATIVE MEDIA LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/24/21 (bw, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15352420.), filed by BEMCY LLP. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARNOLD, JOSEPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEMCY LLP v. GILEAD SCIENCES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEMCY LLP
Represented By: JOSEPH A. ARNOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GILEAD SCIENCES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INITIATIVE MEDIA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?