BELMONT LLC v. THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: BELMONT LLC
Defendant: THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2021cv04002
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 Notice Re: Arbitration Videoconference (Attachments: #1 CONSENT FORM)(cjh, )
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS MAGISTRATE LYNNE A. SITARSKI; ETC.. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 9/24/21. 9/24/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED. (JL)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(MACBRIDE, JONATHAN)
September 14, 2021 Filing 5 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (jaa, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Corporation, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company with Certificate of Service by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(MACBRIDE, JONATHAN)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15388530), filed by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, #3 Designation Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(MACBRIDE, JONATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELMONT LLC v. THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BELMONT LLC
Represented By: VINCENT J. DOTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JONATHAN R. MACBRIDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?