Hill et ux v. Harry et al
Plaintiff: DONNA HILL and DWAYNE HILL
Defendant: Supt. Harry, Supt. Sorber, Deputy Superintendent Bradley, Deputy Superintendent Terra, Unit Manager Stenkowski and Correctional Officer Knaub
Case Number: 2:2021cv04084
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE THAT PLAINTIFF FILED AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THE MIDDLE DISTRICT by DWAYNE HILL (bw, )
October 4, 2021 Copy of Order/Notice dated 9/24/21 (Document # 15) re-mailed to DWAYNE HILL on 10/5/21. (lisad, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 19 Copy of Order/Notice dated 9/24/21 (Document # 15) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to DWAYNE HILL for the following reason: not deliverable as addressed. (jaa, ) Modified on 10/6/2021 (lisad, ).
September 30, 2021 COPY OF DOC. NOS. 14, 15, 16 AND 17 HAVE BEEN RE-MAILED TO PRO SE, HILL, DUE TO CHANGE OF ADDRESS. (bw, )
September 29, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number PPE232388 (sbt, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by DWAYNE HILL(amas, )
September 24, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TERMINATE SUPT. HARRY AND CORRECTIONAL OFFICER KNAUB AS DEFENDANTS. THE CLAIMS OUTLINED HEREIN ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ALL EIGHTH AMENDMENT CLAIMS BASED ON THE FAILURE TO PROVIDE MEDICAL TREATMENT AT SCI PHOENIX ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. HILL IS GIVEN 30 DAYS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. UPON THE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT THE CLERK SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND HILL A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S FORM COMPLAINT FOR A PRISONER FILING A CIVIL RIGHTS ACTION, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/24/21. 9/24/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (amas, )
September 24, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/24/21. 9/24/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas, )
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT THE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 9/24/21. 9/24/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas, )
September 24, 2021 COPY OF DOC. NO. 15 HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, HILL. (bw, )
September 24, 2021 COPY OF DOC. NO. 16, 17 AND PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT FORM(S) HAVE BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, HILL. (bw, )
September 15, 2021 Filing 14 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (sbt, )
September 15, 2021 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:21-cv-01424. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 15, 2021 Pro Se Guidelines Mailed out 9/15/21 (sbt, )
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - In accord with the accompanying Memorandum #11 : 1. Pltfs mtns for leave to proceed ifp #8 and #10 are Granted;2. Pltf Dwayne Hill shall pay the full filing fee of $350.00, based on the financial information provided in the application to proceed ifp. The full filing fee shall be paid regardless of the outcome of the litigation;3. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1) and (2), the Superintendent/Warden, or other appropriate official at Pltf Dwayne Hills place of confinement is directed to deduct fees as directed in this order:4. The Clerk of Court is directed to forward a copy of this Order to the Superintendent/Warden of the institution where Pltf Dwayne Hill is presently confined;5. The complaint #1 is DEEMED FILED;6. Pltf Donna Hills claims, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted;7. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Donna Hill;8. Pltf Dwayne Hills claims against Dft Harry, as well as his Eighth Amendment claims concerning the denial of medical care at SCI Camp Hill, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Pltf Dwayne Hill may file an amended complaint within (30) days of the date of this Order. If Pltf Dwayne Hill elects to file an amended complaint, Pltf is advised to adhere to the standards set forth in the FRCP and the directives set forth by this Court in its accompanying Memorandum. 9. The Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER Pltf Dwayne Hills claims against Dfts Sorber, Bradley, Terra, and Stenkowski to the USDC for the ED of PA. The Clerk of Court is then directed to terminate these individuals as Dfts in the above-captioned action;10. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail Pltf a civil rights complaint form; and11. The Court will defer service of the complaint for (30) days. If Pltf Dwayne Hill fails to file an amended complaint within (30) days of the date hereof, the Court will take further steps to effect service of the original complaint upon Dft Knaub. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 9/8/21. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/15/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM re Complaint #1 filed by Donna Hill (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 9/8/21. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/15/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 10 UNCERTIFIED MOTION (Application) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donna Hill.(ao) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/15/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the Warden or other appropriate official of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide to the Court, under oath, or declare under penalty of perjury, a statement of the current balance in the Plaintiffs account and a record of the transactions in his account that have occurred with the preceding six (6) months. Order sent to Superintendent and plaintiff. Signed by LP on 08/27/2021. (lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/15/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 UNCERTIFIED MOTION (Application) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dwayne Hill.(dw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/15/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from Dwayne Hill re: IFP filings. (dw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/15/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the plaintiff to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Adm. Order sent to Plaintiff Donna Hill. Signed by LP on 08/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP (Short Form))(lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/15/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Adm. Order sent to Inmate Hill Signed by LP on 08/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/15/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Fed and Local Rules) (lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/15/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiffs. (lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/15/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 Application to proceed in forma pauperis submitted by Plaintiff Donna Hill. incorrect form. (lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/15/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Dwayne Hill, Donna Hill. (Attachments: #1 Inmate's Request to Staff Member dated 3/22/2021 with attached Response, #2 Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Dept. of Corrections Misconduct Report dated 06/28/2021, #3 Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Dept. of Corrections DC-ADM 801 Informal Resolution submitted by inmate dated June 23, 2021, #4 Commonwealth of PA/Dept. of Corrections Inmate to remain in AC custody pending hearing dated June 30, 2021)(lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/15/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill et ux v. Harry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DWAYNE HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supt. Harry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supt. Sorber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Superintendent Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Superintendent Terra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit Manager Stenkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Knaub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?