Cochran v. The State of Philadelphia Courts et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Joseph Melvin Cochran
Defendant: The State of Philadelphia Courts, -N- My Judge in Philadelphia's Court and Norristown State and Hospital Mental Health Forensic
Case Number: 2:2021cv04098
Filed: September 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT COCHRAN'S CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ALSO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO COCHRAN AT THE ADDRESS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 11/10/21. 11/10/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas, )
September 17, 2021 COPY OF DOC. NO. 6 HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, COCHRAN. (bw, )
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IF COCHRAN SEEKS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS HE SHALL, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER, FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT; OR SUBMIT THE $402 FILING FEE TO THE CLERK OF COURT. IN ADDITION TO THE ADDRESS NOTED ON THE DOCKET FOR COCHRAN, THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ALSO SEND A COPY OF THIS RDER TO COCHRAN AT THE FOLLOWING ADDRESS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 9/16/21. 9/16/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas, )
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (sbt, )
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-07353. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 15, 2021 Pro Se Guidelines Mailed on 9/15/21. (sbt, )
September 8, 2021 Mailed a copy of #3 Order, to Joseph Melvin Cochran, NYSID: 09693678M, B&C: 3492102383 at Bellevue Hospital, 27th Street, 1st Avenue, 19th Floor - North, Manhattan, NY 10016. (dsh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/15/2021.]
September 7, 2021 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/15/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/7/2021) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/15/2021.]
September 7, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/15/2021.]
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against -N- My Judge in Philadelphia's Court and Norristown State, Hospital Mental Health Forensic, The State of Philadelphia Courts. Document filed by Joseph Melvin Cochran..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/15/2021.]
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Joseph Melvin Cochran..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/15/2021.]
September 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/15/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cochran v. The State of Philadelphia Courts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Joseph Melvin Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Philadelphia Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: -N- My Judge in Philadelphia's Court and Norristown State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Mental Health Forensic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?