Ricci et al v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Plaintiff: Wayne Ricci and Sharon Ricci
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASULTY COMPANY and STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2021cv04114
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 13 Notice Re: Arbitration Videoconference (Attachments: #1 CONSENT FORM)(cjh, )
November 3, 2021 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSONPretrial Conference held on 11/3/21. (rf, )
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT MAGISTRATE JUDGE STRAWBRIDGE WILL CONTACT COUNSEL TO SCHEDULE A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; DISCOVERY DUE BY 2/28/2022., MOTIONS DUE BY 3/30/2022; PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 4/11/2022., DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 4/21/2022., TRIAL POOL SET FOR 5/2/2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 11/3/21. 11/3/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) Modified on 11/8/2021 (rf, ).
October 25, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/3/2021 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL INITIATE THE CALL AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520. (Attachments: #1 Conf. Info Sheet, #2 Trial Procedures)(ahf, )
October 22, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(KOBESKI, JUSTIN)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 6) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/19/2021.10/19/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, filed by Wayne Ricci, Sharon Ricci.(DOTO, VINCENT) Modified on 10/12/2021 (lisad, ).
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 First MOTION to Dismiss Count II - Bad Faith filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.BRIEF. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B- Part 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part 2)(KOBESKI, JUSTIN) Modified on 10/12/2021 (lisad, ).
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Dismiss Treble Damages Ad Damnum Clause by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (KOBESKI, JUSTIN) Modified on 10/12/2021 (lisad, ).
September 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by YOLANDA KONOPACKA DESIPIO on behalf of STATE FARM FIRE AND CASULTY COMPANY (DESIPIO, YOLANDA)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (sg, )
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASULTY COMPANY.(KOBESKI, JUSTIN)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASULTY COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15412327), filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASULTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(KOBESKI, JUSTIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricci et al v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Ricci
Represented By: VINCENT J. DOTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Ricci
Represented By: VINCENT J. DOTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASULTY COMPANY
Represented By: JUSTIN KOBESKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: JUSTIN KOBESKI
Represented By: YOLANDA KONOPACKA DESIPIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?