Del Orbe Estrella v. The Progressive Corporation
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Del Orbe Estrella
Defendant: The Progressive Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv04131
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT STIPULATION IS APPROVED. FURTHER ORDERED THAT CASE SHALL BE REMANDED TO THE STATE COURT FROM WHICH IT WAS REMOVED. CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THE MATTER AS CLOSED AND REMANDED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 9/22/21. 9/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.*COPY OF ORDER EMAIL TO COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY*(rf, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Cap Damages at $74,999.99 and Remand by The Progressive Corporation. (DAPPER, KATHLEEN)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (sg, )
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON Status Conference HELD BY TELEPHONE held on 9/21/21. (JL )
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt, )
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by The Progressive Corporation.(TWILLA, DANIEL)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Progressive Corporation (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15414083), filed by The Progressive Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form)(TWILLA, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Orbe Estrella v. The Progressive Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Del Orbe Estrella
Represented By: JOHN G. MALONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Progressive Corporation
Represented By: DANIEL J. TWILLA
Represented By: KATHLEEN PATRICIA DAPPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?