KONG v. THE EXONE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: ZHAOQUN KONG
Defendant: THE EXONE COMPANY, JOHN F. HARTNER, S. KENT ROCKWELL, JOHN IRVIN, GREGORY F. PASHKE, LLOYD A. SEMPLE, WILLIAM STROME, ROGER THILTGEN, BONNIE K. WACHTEL, TEXAS MERGER SUB I, INC., TEXAS MERGER SUB II, LLC and DESKTOP METAL, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04165
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Returned Executed on 10/21/2021, answer due 11/12/2021 by ZHAOQUN KONG as to William Strome (ACKERMAN, MARC) Modified on 11/2/2021 (tjd).
November 1, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Returned Executed on 10/21/2021, answer due 11/12/2021 by ZHAOQUN KONG as to S. Kent Rockwell (ACKERMAN, MARC) Modified on 11/2/2021 (tjd).
November 1, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Returned Executed on 10/21/2021, answer due 11/12/2021 by ZHAOQUN KONG as to Roger Thiltgen (ACKERMAN, MARC) Modified on 11/2/2021 (tjd).
November 1, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Returned Executed on 10/21/2021, answer due 11/12/2021 by ZHAOQUN KONG as to Lloyd A. Semple (ACKERMAN, MARC) Modified on 11/2/2021 (tjd).
November 1, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Returned Executed on 10/21/2021, answer due 11/12/2021 by ZHAOQUN KONG as to John Irvin (ACKERMAN, MARC) Modified on 11/2/2021 (tjd).
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Returned Executed on 10/21/2021, answer due 11/12/2021 by ZHAOQUN KONG as to John F. Hartner (ACKERMAN, MARC) Modified on 11/2/2021 (tjd).
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed on 10/21/2021, answer due 11/12/2021 by ZHAOQUN KONG as to Gregory F. Pashke (ACKERMAN, MARC) Modified on 11/2/2021 (tjd).
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed on 10/21/2021, answer due 11/12/2021 by ZHAOQUN KONG as to Bonnie K. Wachtel (ACKERMAN, MARC) Modified on 11/2/2021 (tjd).
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed on 10/21/2021, answer due 11/12/2021 by ZHAOQUN KONG as to Texas Merger Sub II, LLC (ACKERMAN, MARC) Modified on 11/2/2021 (tjd).
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed on 10/21/2021, answer due 11/12/2021 by ZHAOQUN KONG as to Texas Merger Sub I, Inc. (ACKERMAN, MARC) Modified on 11/2/2021 (tjd).
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed on 10/21/2021, answer due 11/12/2021 by ZHAOQUN KONG as to Desktop Metal, Inc. (ACKERMAN, MARC) Modified on 11/2/2021 (tjd).
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed on 10/21/2021, answer due 11/12/2021 by ZHAOQUN KONG as to The ExOne Company (ACKERMAN, MARC) Modified on 11/2/2021 (tjd).
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS MAGISTRATE ELIZABETH T. HEY. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 9/28/21. 9/28/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 22, 2021 Summons Issued as to DESKTOP METAL, INC., JOHN F. HARTNER, JOHN IRVIN, GREGORY F. PASHKE, S. KENT ROCKWELL, LLOYD A. SEMPLE, WILLIAM STROME, TEXAS MERGER SUB I, INC., TEXAS MERGER SUB II, LLC, THE EXONE COMPANY, ROGER THILTGEN, BONNIE K. WACHTEL. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/22/21 (bw, )
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ZHAOQUN KONG.(ACKERMAN, MARC)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DESKTOP METAL, INC., JOHN F. HARTNER, JOHN IRVIN, GREGORY F. PASHKE, S. KENT ROCKWELL, LLOYD A. SEMPLE, WILLIAM STROME, TEXAS MERGER SUB I, INC., TEXAS MERGER SUB II, LLC, THE EXONE COMPANY, ROGER THILTGEN, BONNIE K. WACHTEL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15422326.), filed by ZHAOQUN KONG.(ACKERMAN, MARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KONG v. THE EXONE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZHAOQUN KONG
Represented By: MARC L. ACKERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE EXONE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN F. HARTNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. KENT ROCKWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN IRVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY F. PASHKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD A. SEMPLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM STROME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER THILTGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BONNIE K. WACHTEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEXAS MERGER SUB I, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEXAS MERGER SUB II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DESKTOP METAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?