RIVERA v. RANSOM et al
Petitioner: MARCOS A. RIVERA
Respondent: SUP'T KEVIN J. RANSOM, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 2:2021cv04178
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Referring Judge: SCOTT W REID
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 COPY OF DOC. NO. 6 HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, RIVERA. (bw, )
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 Receipt of State Court Record on 10/13/21, sent from DEPUTY CLERK TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE REID TO DEPUTY CLERK. (JL )
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO. #5 ) IS GRANTED AND THIS MATTER IS STAYED PENDING THE RESOLUTION OF PETITIONER'S STATE PCRA APPEAL PROCEEDING AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID ON 10/14/21. 10/14/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas, )
October 13, 2021 State Court Record received and forwarded to Magistrate Judge Scott W. Reid on 10/13/21. (jaa, )
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO STAY AND ABEYANCE, FILED BY MARCOS A. RIVERA.(amas, )
September 29, 2021 PLEADING #4 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL )
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY IS ADDED AS A PARTY RESPONDENT AND THE CAPTION IS HEREBY SO AMENDED. THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY SHALL FILE WITH THE CLERK OF THIS COURT COPIES OF ALL RECORDS, INCLUDING TRANSCRIPTS OF NOTES OF TESTIMONY AT ARRAIGNMENT, TRIAL, SENTENCING, SUPPRESSION HEARINGS, POST CONVICTION HEARINGS, PETITIONS, PLEADINGS, OPINIONS AND BRIEFS OF STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS IN THE MATTER OF RIVERA v. RANSOM et al, COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA,21-CV-4178 WITHIN 45 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. PRISONER STATE RECORD DUE BY 11/15/2021.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID ON 9/28/21. 9/29/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (amas, )
September 28, 2021 A COPY OF THE PETITION, DOCKET, AND ORDER TO RESPOND WAS E-MAILED TO THE PHILA D.A. AND THE ATTY GENERAL AND FAXED TO THE PHILA. CCP ON 9/29/21. (amas, )
September 28, 2021 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #3 TO PETITIONER ON 9/28/21. (jaa, )
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY D.A.'S OFFICE AND THE PA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL WITH A COPY OF THE PETITION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 9/27/21. 9/27/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas, )
September 27, 2021 A COPY OF THE PETITION, DOCKET AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAG WAS E-MAILED TO THE ATTY GENERAL ON 9/27/21. (amas, )
September 23, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number PPE232211 (rf, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MARCOS A. RIVERA. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIVERA v. RANSOM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARCOS A. RIVERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SUP'T KEVIN J. RANSOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?