Nunes v. PMC PROPERTY GROUP, INC.
Plaintiff: Keana Nunes
Defendant: PMC PROPERTY GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04181
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by BRENDAN W. MEHLER on behalf of Keana Nunes (MEHLER, BRENDAN)
October 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ELISABETH G. BASSANI on behalf of PMC PROPERTY GROUP, INC. (BASSANI, ELISABETH)
October 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER DRAKE DURHAM on behalf of PMC PROPERTY GROUP, INC. with Certificate of Service(DURHAM, CHRISTOPHER)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Keana Nunes. PMC PROPERTY GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 9/29/2021. 9/29/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PMC PROPERTY GROUP, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15425239.), filed by Keana Nunes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
September 22, 2021 Summons Issued as to PMC PROPERTY GROUP, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/22/21 (bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunes v. PMC PROPERTY GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keana Nunes
Represented By: MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.
Represented By: BRENDAN W. MEHLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMC PROPERTY GROUP, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER DRAKE DURHAM
Represented By: ELISABETH G. BASSANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?