STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO v. PULTEGROUP INC
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO
Defendant: PULTEGROUP INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04277
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM L. RYAN on behalf of PULTEGROUP INC. with Certificate of Service(RYAN, WILLIAM)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PULTEGROUP INC..(PEARL, AMY)
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by PULTEGROUP INC..Notice of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Certification of Jane Celovsky with Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(PEARL, AMY)
November 5, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO re: Chris Stanton served Summons and Complaint upon PULTEGROUP INC. by Registered Agent. PULTEGROUP INC. served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (DE LUCA, DANIEL)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PULTE GROUP INC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15440120.), filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(DE LUCA, DANIEL)
September 29, 2021 Summons Issued as to PULTEGROUP INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/29/21 (bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO v. PULTEGROUP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO
Represented By: DANIEL J. DE LUCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PULTEGROUP INC.
Represented By: AMY E. PEARL
Represented By: WILLIAM L. RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?