Jones v. McDonald
Plaintiff: Jermaine Jones
Defendant: Corrections Officer McDonald and CORRECTIONS OFFICER JOHN MCDONALD
Case Number: 2:2021cv04361
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT of Plaintiff Jones against JOHN MCDONALD. (md, ).
October 18, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jermaine Jones. McDonald waiver sent on 10/11/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(JUBELIRER, LAURIE)
October 11, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Corrections Officer McDonald c/o Brian Phillips, Esquire on 10/11/2021 by Jermaine Jones. Waiver of Service due by 11/10/2021. (JUBELIRER, LAURIE)
October 5, 2021 Summons Issued as to McDonald. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 10/5/21 (bw, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Jones, Jermaine against McDonald, filed by Jermaine Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(JUBELIRER, LAURIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Jones
Represented By: LAURIE R. JUBELIRER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Officer McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONS OFFICER JOHN MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?