PAYTON v. ALLY BANK
Plaintiff: RAHEEM PAYTON
Defendant: ALLY BANK
Case Number: 2:2021cv04689
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 RAHEEM PAYTON MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS.(JL )
October 28, 2021 COPY OF DOC. NO. 3 AND NON-PRISONER IFP APPLICATION FORM(S) HAVE BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, PAYTON. (bw, )
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT IF PAYTON SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER PAY $402 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE PAYTON WITH AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/27/21. 10/27/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas, )
October 26, 2021 NOTICE OF PRO SE GUIDELINES HAVE BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, PAYTON. (bw, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALLY BANK, filed by RAHEEM PAYTON. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED) No envelope included. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(bw, ) Modified on 10/27/2021 (lisad, ).
October 21, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by RAHEEM PAYTON. (bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAYTON v. ALLY BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAHEEM PAYTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLY BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?