GUILLOTEL et al v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al
Plaintiff: ANITA GUILLOTEL and THIERRY GUILLOTEL
Defendant: MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP., JOHN DOE, JANE DOE and XYZ CORP
Case Number: 2:2021cv04819
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANITA GUILLOTEL, THIERRY GUILLOTEL. MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. waiver sent on 11/3/2021, answer due 1/2/2022. (SADAKA, MARK)
November 30, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANITA GUILLOTEL, THIERRY GUILLOTEL. MERCK & CO., INC. waiver sent on 11/3/2021, answer due 1/2/2022. (SADAKA, MARK)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by DINO S. SANGIAMO on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. with Certificate of Service(SANGIAMO, DINO)
November 2, 2021 Summons Issued as to MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 11/2/2021 (sg, )
November 1, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ANITA GUILLOTEL, THIERRY GUILLOTEL. (JL )
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15517936.), filed by ANITA GUILLOTEL, THIERRY GUILLOTEL. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(SADAKA, MARK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GUILLOTEL et al v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANITA GUILLOTEL
Represented By: MARK T. SADAKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THIERRY GUILLOTEL
Represented By: MARK T. SADAKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK & CO., INC.
Represented By: DINO S. SANGIAMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Represented By: DINO S. SANGIAMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?