GARRETT v. REPSHER et al
Petitioner: LUNDES GARRETT
Respondent: K. REPSHER and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF
Case Number: 2:2021cv05593
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by LUNDES GARRETT(jaa, )
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/11/22. 1/12/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PETITIONER.(jaa, )
January 11, 2022 CASE TRANSFERRED TO MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA VIA CM/ECF ELECTRONIC TRANSFER. (jaa, )
January 5, 2022 PRO SE GUIDELINES MAILED TO GARRETT (rf, )
January 4, 2022 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (sg, )
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by LUNDES GARRETT.(sg, )
December 27, 2021 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by LUNDES GARRETT. (sg, )
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by LUNDES GARRETT..(sg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARRETT v. REPSHER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LUNDES GARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: K. REPSHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?