WARD v. STATE FARM AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: JAMES WARD
Defendant: STATE FARM AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2021cv05668
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 5/6/2022 AT 9:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY VIA TELECONFERENCE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 2/15/22. 2/15/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT WE STRIKE DEFENDANT'S JURY DEMAND (ECF NO. 13) WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WILL PROCEED UNDER OUR 2/9/22 ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/11/22. 2/11/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REMAND TO ARBITRATION #12 IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/11/2022.2/11/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(uh)
February 10, 2022 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STATE FARM AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (TENTHOFF, JEFFREY) Modified on 2/11/2022 (mbh). (STRIKEN PER ORDER #15)
February 10, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to Federal Arbitration filed by STATE FARM AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TENTHOFF, JEFFREY)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT ALL MOTIONS TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS SHALL BE FILED BY 3/2/22. ALL FACT AND EXPERT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 4/26/22. THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE HEFFLEY FOR SETTLEMENT. SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 5/2/22. THE PARTIES SHALL FILE PRETRIAL MEMORANDA BY 5/27/22. ALL MOTIONS AFFECTING TRIAL PRESENTATIONS, ETC ARE DUE BY 6/1/22. COUNSEL IS ATTACHED FOR A ONE-DAY NON JURY TRIAL BEGINNING ON 6/10/22, AT 9:00 AM, IN COURTROOM 6B. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/9/22. 2/9/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
February 9, 2022 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY Pretrial Conference held on 2/9/22 (amas)
February 1, 2022 Filing 9 Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by JAMES WARD. (LEONARD, ANTHONY)
February 1, 2022 Filing 8 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by STATE FARM AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(TENTHOFF, JEFFREY)
January 31, 2022 Filing 7 Disclosure by JAMES WARD.(LEONARD, ANTHONY)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE OVER THE PHONE, ON 2/9/22, AT 8:45 AM, BEFORE HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/26/22. 1/27/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
January 26, 2022 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint together with with New Matter by STATE FARM AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY.(TENTHOFF, JEFFREY)
January 24, 2022 Filing 4 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (tomg)
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 Letter dated January 10, 2022 by JAMES WARD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LEONARD, ANTHONY)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT BOTH PARTIES ARE GRANTED LEAVE TO SHOW CAUSE, NO LATER THAN 1/10/22, AS TO WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT FORTHWITH REMAND TO THE STATE COURT DUE TO LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/3/22. 1/3/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15634923), filed by STATE FARM AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit)(TENTHOFF, JEFFREY) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/30/2021) (sbt, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 12/30/2021) (sbt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARD v. STATE FARM AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES WARD
Represented By: ANTHONY J. LEONARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JEFFREY E. TENTHOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?