Ellison v. Merck & Co Inc et al
Plaintiff: Charlotte Ellison
Defendant: Merck Co., Inc. and MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP
Case Number: 2:2021cv20124
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DINO S. SANGIAMO on behalf of MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP, Merck Co., Inc. with Certificate of Service(SANGIAMO, DINO)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-00133. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-88) transferring this case to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania as part of MDL No. 2848, In Re: Zostavax (Zoster Vaccine Live) Products Liability Litigation on this date. Signed by the Clerk of the Court John W. Nichols. (jbh) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 11/19/2021.]
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all Defendants filed by Charlotte Ellison. (Fee of $ 402 paid, Receipt Number LIT084035.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ldb) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 11/19/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellison v. Merck & Co Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Ellison
Represented By: James Harrison Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck Co., Inc.
Represented By: DINO S. SANGIAMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP
Represented By: DINO S. SANGIAMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?