Keefe v. Owens-Illinois, et al
Plaintiff: Michael Keefe, Keefe, Jeanne, Estate of and Kelly A. Keefe
Defendant: Inc. Owens-Illinois, OWENS-CORNING FIBERGLAS CORP, OWENS-ILLINOIS GLASS COMPANY and EMPIRE ACE INSULATION MANUFACTURING CORP
Case Number: 2:2021cv60006
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT ANY RESPONSES TO THE MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FRCP 60(a) SHALL BE FILED BY 11/4/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/28/21. 10/28/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 17 PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(a)(mbh, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:85-cv-00994. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 18, 1992 Judge Charles R. Weiner. Order of Dismissal entered in MDL-875 on 9/18/92. "...cases are dismissed without prejudice..." See Document #6805 in MML 1, MML 2. Copies sent to Liaison Counsel. (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]
June 15, 1992 Senior Judge Charles R. Weiner . Endorsed Order granting [0-1] motion for Francis M. Lynch to withdraw as attorney (see mml 1&2, #6786) (Terminated (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]
June 15, 1992 Motion by Empire Ace Insulatio for Francis M. Lynch to withdraw as attorney (see mml 1&2, #6786) to Senior Judge Charles R. Weiner (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]
December 18, 1991 Motion by Michael Keefe, Keefe, Jeanne, Estat, Kelly A Keefe, Owens-Corning Fiberg to dismiss Owens-Corning Fiberglas Corp. (SEE MML #1 & #2, #6750) (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]
November 15, 1991 Interdistrict transfer to Eastern District of Pennsylvania, per July 29, 1991 transfer order of Multidistrict Litigation Panel in In Re: asbestos litigation (MDL-875). Case closed. (vah) Modified on 11/19/1991 [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]
July 31, 1991 Motion by Michael Keefe, Kelly A Keefe to dismiss Keene Corporation (SEE MML #1-5, #6684) (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]
May 23, 1991 Judge Rya W. Zobel . Endorsed Order granting [0-1] motion to dismiss. (See MML #1, & #2, #6623) (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]
May 9, 1991 Motion by Owens-Corning Fiberg to dismiss. (See MML #1, & #2, #6623) (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]
January 31, 1991 Motion by Michael Keefe, Keefe, Jeanne, Estat, Kelly A Keefe, Owens-Illinois, Inc, Owens-Illinois Glass to dismiss Owens-Illinois, Inc and Owens-Illinois Glass Co (SEE MML #1 & #2, #6683) (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keefe v. Owens-Illinois, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Keefe
Represented By: GARRETT J. BRADLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keefe, Jeanne, Estate of
Represented By: GARRETT J. BRADLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly A. Keefe
Represented By: GARRETT J. BRADLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inc. Owens-Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS-CORNING FIBERGLAS CORP
Represented By: BRUCE G. TUCKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS-ILLINOIS GLASS COMPANY
Represented By: PETER J. RUBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMPIRE ACE INSULATION MANUFACTURING CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?