Bonavitacola v. Ownes-Illinois, et al
Plaintiff: Patrick J. Bonavitacola, Sr. and Rita Bonavitacola
Defendant: Inc. Owens-Illinois, OWENS-ILLINOIS GLASS COMPANY, KEENE CORPORATION, OWENS-CORNING FIBERGLAS CORP, SPRAYCRAFT CORP, UNITED STATES GYPSUM COMPANY, UNITED STATES MINERAL PRODUCTS COMPANY, FORTY-EIGHT INSULATIONS INC., FIBREBOARD CORPORATION, PITTSBURGH-CORNING CORPORATION, EAGLE PICHER INDUSTRIES INC, SOUTHERN TEXTILE CORPORATION, H.K PORTER COMPANY, INC., CELOTEX CORPORATION, NICOLET INDUSTRIES, EMPIRE-ACE INSULATION MANUFACTURING COMPANY, GAF CORPORATION, Inc. Carey Canada and NATIONAL GYPSUM COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2021cv60008
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT ANY RESPONSES TO THE MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FRCP 60(a) SHALL BE FILED BY 11/4/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/28/21. 10/28/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 19 PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(a). (mbh, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:84-cv-03338. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 15, 2021 Filing 17 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 1253 in MDL Case 875 received the Eastern District of Pennsylvania requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. This case is transferred pursuant to Administrative Order No. 11, entered in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania on August 15, 2006. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]
March 4, 1994 Filing 21 Amended complaint by Rita Bonavitacola , (Answer due 3/14/94 for Spraycraft Corp., for Owens Corning Fiberg, for Owens-Illinois, Inc., for Owens-Illinois Glass, for Keene Corporation ) amending against Pittsburgh-Corning, Eagle Picher Indust., Southern Textile, H.K. Porter Co., Celotex Corporation, Nicolet Industries, Empire-Ace Insul., GAF Corporation, Carey Canada, Inc., National Gypsum, filed. (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]
March 4, 1994 Filing 20 Notice of substitution by Rita Bonavitacola (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]
March 4, 1994 Filing 19 Plaintiff, Rita Bonavitacola, as Executrix of the Estate of Patrick J. Bonavitacola, Sr., suggests upon the record the death of Patrick J. Bonavitacola, Sr. during the pendancy of this action. (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]
October 28, 1993 Opinion or Order Order of Judge Charles R. Weiner: motion to dismiss by Ritz Bonavitacola, Patrick J. Bonavitacola Sr. allowed dismissing action against party Spraycraft Corp. See MML #1, #2, document #6865. (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]
September 18, 1992 Judge Charles R. Weiner. Order of Dismissal entered in MDL-875 on 9/18/92. "...cases are dismissed without prejudice..." See Document #6805 in MML 1, MML 2. Copies sent to Liaison Counsel. (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]
April 3, 1992 Filing 18 Senior Judge Charles R. Weiner . Order granting [17-1] motion for leave to file First Amended Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiffs be permitted to amend their complaint to reflect the addition of a claim for lung cancer, which was diagnosed after the filing of the original complaint. (lmh) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]
March 30, 1992 Filing 17 Motion by Patrick J Bonavitacola Sr, Ritz Bonavitacola for leave to file First Amended Complaint (lmh) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]
November 15, 1991 Interdistrict transfer to Eastern District of Pennsylvania, per July 29, 1991 transfer order of Multidistrict Litigation Panel in In Re: asbestos litigation (MDL-875). Case closed. (vah) Modified on 11/19/1991 [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]
July 31, 1991 Motion by Patrick J Bonavitacola Sr, Keene Corporation to dismiss Keene Corporation (SEE MML #1-5, #6684) (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]
May 23, 1991 Judge Rya W. Zobel . Endorsed Order granting [0-1] motion to dismiss. (See MML #1, & #2, #6623) (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]
May 9, 1991 Motion by Owens Corning Fiberg to dismiss. (See MML #1, & #2, #6623) (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]
January 31, 1991 Motion by Patrick J Bonavitacola Sr, Ritz Bonavitacola, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Owens-Illinois Glass to dismiss Owens-Illinois, Inc. and Owens-Illinois Glass Co (SEE MML #1 & #2, #6683) (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonavitacola v. Ownes-Illinois, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick J. Bonavitacola, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Bonavitacola
Represented By: GARRETT J. BRADLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inc. Owens-Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS-ILLINOIS GLASS COMPANY
Represented By: PETER J. RUBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEENE CORPORATION
Represented By: LAWRENCE G. CETRULO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS-CORNING FIBERGLAS CORP
Represented By: BRUCE G. TUCKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPRAYCRAFT CORP
Represented By: DAVID M. GOVERNO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES GYPSUM COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES MINERAL PRODUCTS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORTY-EIGHT INSULATIONS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIBREBOARD CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PITTSBURGH-CORNING CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAGLE PICHER INDUSTRIES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN TEXTILE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.K PORTER COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CELOTEX CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICOLET INDUSTRIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMPIRE-ACE INSULATION MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAF CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inc. Carey Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL GYPSUM COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?