IN RE: NONPARTY SUBPOENA OF THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Plaintiff: CAITLIN BERNARD
Defendant: THE INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE INDIANA MEDICAL LICENSING BOARD
Petitioner: THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
In Re: NONPARTY SUBPOENA OF THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Case Number: 2:2021mc00009
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M GALLAGHER
Nature of Suit: Miscellaneous
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Copies of docket entries 1 through 22, and copy of docket report, emailed to the Southern District of Indiana on 3/24/2021. (md, )
March 23, 2021 Original record transferred to the Southern District of Indiana via interdistrict transfer system. (md, )
March 22, 2021 Document #22 mailed to counsel. (kw, )
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF 3/19/21 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF NON-PARTY THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS MOTION TO QUASH (ECF NO. 1), DEFENDANTS THE INDIVIDUAL MEMEBERS OF THE INDIANA MEDICAL LICENSING BOARD'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION AND CROSS-MOTION TO COMPEL (ECF NO. 7), AND THE RESPONSE AND REPLIES THERETO, AND EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCES APPEARING; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THIS MISCELLANEOUS ACTION TO THE CLERK OF THE U.S.D.C. SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA TO BE DOCKETED AT BERNARD, M.D., ET AL V. INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE INDIANA MEDICAL LICENSING BOARD ET AL NO. 19-CV-01660-SEB-DML, BEFORE THE HONORABLE SARA EVANS BARKER. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE IN THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 3/19/21. 3/19/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (COPY NOT MAILED TO NEW YORK COUNSEL) Modified on 3/19/2021 (dt, ).
March 19, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash and Cross-Motion to Compel Compliance with State of Indiana's Deposition Subpoena and Document Subpoena (filed pursuant to Order granting leave to file reply (Dkt. no. 18)) filed by THE INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE INDIANA MEDICAL LICENSING BOARD. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KLEIN, ROBERT)
March 18, 2021 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Status Conference held on 3/18/21. (mas, )
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF 3/16/21 THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE WITH COUNSEL IS SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 18, 2021 AT 1:00PM. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 3/16/21. 3/16/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF 3/16/21 THAT THE STATE OF INDIANA'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY IS GRANTED AND THE STATE OF INDIANA IS GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF OF NO MORE THAN 10 PAGES WITHIN 7 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THE FILING OF TJUH'S OPPOSITION PAPERS (DKT NO. 16) SIGNED BYJUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 3/16/21. 3/16/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
March 15, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Reply filed by THE INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE INDIANA MEDICAL LICENSING BOARD.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of State of Indiana's Motion for Leave to File Reply, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(KLEIN, ROBERT)
March 15, 2021 Mailed doc. 15 to Counsel. (er, )
March 12, 2021 Filing 16 Reply Memorandum in Futher Support re #1 MOTION to Quash and in Opposition to State of Indiana's Cross-Motion to Compel, with Certificate of Service, OPPOSITION re RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash and Cross-Motion to Compel Compliance with State of Indiana's Deposition Subpoena and Document Subpoena filed by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julia Chapman, #2 Exhibit 1 to Chapman Decl. (Nov. 2020 Emails), #3 Exhibit 2 to Chapman Decl. (Dec. 2020, Jan. 2021 Emails), #4 Exhibit 3 to Chapman Decl. (Jan. 25, 2021 Email), #5 Exhibit 4 to Chapman Decl. (Jan. 29, 2021 Email), #6 Text of Proposed Order)(TUBBS, STEFANIE) Modified on 3/15/2021 (lisad, ).
March 2, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash and Cross-Motion to Compel Compliance with State of Indiana's Deposition Subpoena and Document Subpoena. RESPONSES DUE BY 3/12/2021. REPLIES DUE BY 3/12/2021. (dt, )
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF 3/2/21 THAT THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY (ECF NO. 13) IS GRANTED. THOMS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY MAY FILE ITS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF IT'S MOTION TO QUASH AT THE SAME TIME AS AND CONSOLIDATED WITH ITS BRIEF IN IN OPPOSITION TO THE STATE OF INDIANA'S CROSS-MOTION TO COMPEL NO LATER THAN 3/12/21. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 3/2/21. 3/2/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (DT) (copy not mailed to counsel) Modified on 3/4/2021 (dt, ). Modified on 3/12/2021 (dt, ).
March 2, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in, RESPONSE to Motion to Quash of Defendant (Doc. 7) filed by THE INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE INDIANA MEDICAL LICENSING BOARD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(KLEIN, ROBERT) Modified on 3/2/2021 (lisad, ).
March 2, 2021 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRIES #11 AND #12 WITH ECF FORMS TO COUNSEL ON 3/2/21. (jaa, )
March 1, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Reply filed by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Leave to File Reply, #2 Exhibit A, 3/1/2021 Email Correspondence from Respondents' Counsel)(TUBBS, STEFANIE)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF 3/1/21 THAT THE APPLICATION OF ELIZABETH WOLSTEIN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 3/1/21. 3/1/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (COPY NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL)(ECF APPLICATION MAILED TO ATTORNEY)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF 3/1/21 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE MOTION OF DEFENDANTS THE INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE INDIANA LICENSING BOARD, ET AL (THE "STATE OF INDIANA") FOR A NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER CONCERNING THE FILING OF EXHIBITS A THROUGH Q TO THE DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH WOLSTEIN (ECF NO. 10), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. EXHIBITS A THROUGH Q (ECF NO. 9) TO THE DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH WOLSTEIN (ECF NO. 8) ARE DEEMED TIMELY FILED IN CONNECTION WITH THE STATE OF INDIANA'S OPPOSITION TO THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL'S MOTION TO QUASH (ECF NO. 1) AND ITS OWN MOTION TO COMPEL (ECF NO. 7). SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 3/1/21. 3/1/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
February 28, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Relief Nunc Pro Tunc Concerning ECF Filing (Dkt. No. 9) re #8 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #7 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #9 Declaration,,,,, filed by THE INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE INDIANA MEDICAL LICENSING BOARD.Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Robert A. Klein, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(KLEIN, ROBERT)
February 27, 2021 Filing 9 Declaration re #8 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #7 Response in Opposition to Motion,, and in Support of Cross-Motion to Compel Compliance with State of Indiana's Deposition Subpoena and Document Subpoena by THE INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE INDIANA MEDICAL LICENSING BOARD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (List of Exhibits), #2 Exhibit A (Complaint in underlying case), #3 Exhibit B (Singh Study), #4 Exhibit C (12/23/20 email C. Bartolomucci to J. Chapman)), #5 Exhibit D (Doc Subp attached to 12/23/20 email), #6 Exhibit E (Affidavit of 12/29/20 service for Document Subp), #7 Exhibit F (Document Subp served 12/29/20), #8 Exhibit G TJUH 1/19/21 Objs to Document Subp), #9 Exhibit H (1/25/21 email E. Wolstein to J. Chapman)), #10 Exhibit I (1/27/21 letter J. Chapman to E.Wolstein) ), #11 Exhibit J (Affidavit of 1/29/21 service of Deposition Subp), #12 Exhibit K (Deposition Subp served 1/29/21), #13 Exhibit L (1/29/21 email E. Wolstein to J. Chapman)), #14 Exhibit M (2/10/21 email E. Wolstein to J. Chapman), #15 Exhibit N (TJUH 2/12/21 Supp Objs to Document Subp), #16 Exhibit O (Pa. Dept of Health report), #17 Exhibit P (ND Cal. Order 1/29/21), #18 Exhibit Q (ND Cal. Order (2/16/21), #19 Certificate of Service)(KLEIN, ROBERT)
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash and in Support of Cross-Motion to Compel Compliance with State of Indiana's Deposition Subpoena and Document Subpoena filed by THE INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE INDIANA MEDICAL LICENSING BOARD. (KLEIN, ROBERT)
February 26, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash and Cross-Motion to Compel Compliance with State of Indiana's Deposition Subpoena and Document Subpoena filed by THE INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE INDIANA MEDICAL LICENSING BOARD. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Opp. to Motion to Quash and In Supp. of Cross-Motion to Compel, #2 L.R. 26.1(f) Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order to Show Cause, #4 Text of Proposed Order on cross-motions, #5 Certificate of Service)(KLEIN, ROBERT) Modified on 3/2/2021 (lisad, ).
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Elizabeth Wolstein, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14946273.) filed by THE INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE INDIANA MEDICAL LICENSING BOARD.Certificate of Service.(KLEIN, ROBERT)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT A. KLEIN on behalf of THE INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE INDIANA MEDICAL LICENSING BOARD with Certificate of Service(KLEIN, ROBERT)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL re #1 MOTION to Quash with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Feb. 16, 2021, N.D. Cal. Order Denying Motion to Enforce)(TUBBS, STEFANIE)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA CHAPMAN on behalf of THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL with Certificate of Service(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
February 16, 2021 $353.00 Refunded to Counsel. (lisad, )
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by HOPE S. FREIWALD on behalf of THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL with Certificate of Service(FREIWALD, HOPE)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION TO QUASH with Certificate of Service against MARION COUNTY PROSECUTOR, THE INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE INDIANA MEDICAL LICENSING BOARD ( Filing fee $ 49 receipt number 0313-14911828.), filed by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(TUBBS, STEFANIE) Modified on 2/12/2021 (lisad, ). Modified on 2/16/2021 (lisad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: NONPARTY SUBPOENA OF THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE INDIANA MEDICAL LICENSING BOARD
Represented By: ROBERT A. KLEIN
Represented By: ELIZABETH WOLSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAITLIN BERNARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: NONPARTY SUBPOENA OF THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: HOPE S. FREIWALD
Represented By: STEFANIE TUBBS
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?