Groome et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY GROOME and CHRIS PURCELL
Defendant: GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.
Respondent: DARREN BJORN
Case Number: 2:2021mc00013
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Miscellaneous
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Filing 19 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #18 Transcript - PDF, 3/16/21 Entered and Copies Emailed (JL )
March 16, 2021 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING held on 2/24/21, before Judge KEARNEY. Court Reporter/Transcriber ESR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/6/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/14/2021. LAWRENCE COURT TRANSCRIPTION & VIDEO(JL )
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF-RELATORS MOTION IS DENIED AS MOOT. MR. BJORNS COUNSELS ORAL REQUEST FOR COSTS IS DENEID. CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/24/21. 2/24/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 Plaintiffs-Relators Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Compliance with Third-Party Subpoena filed by DARREN BJORN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua Anderson, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Joshua Anderson, #3 Declaration of Elizabeth Morgan, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(CHOI, CAROLINE) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2021: #5 Declaration of Darren Bjorn) (va, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/22/2021) (va, ).
February 22, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLINE S. CHOI on behalf of DARREN BJORN with Certificate of Service(CHOI, CAROLINE)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED THE APPLICATIONS (ECF DOC. NOS. 10, 11, 12, 13) ARE GRANTED AND SIMONA AGNOLUCCI, ESQUIRE AND JOSHUA ANDERSON, ESQUIRE ARE ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN THIS CASE IN THIS COURT UNDER LOCAL RULE 83.5.2(B). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/22/21. 2/22/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
February 22, 2021 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by DARREN BJORN. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number 0313-14930172). (LEE, MARK)
February 22, 2021 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by DARREN BJORN. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number 0313-14930149). (LEE, MARK)
February 19, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Simona Agnolucci by DARREN BJORN.. (LEE, MARK)
February 19, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua Anderson by DARREN BJORN.. (LEE, MARK)
February 19, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua Anderson by DARREN BJORN. .**(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY, INCOMPLETE PDF, ATTY REFILED SEE DOCUMENT #13 )**. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joshua Anderson)(LEE, MARK) Modified on 2/22/2021 (tjd).
February 19, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Simona Agnolucci by DARREN BJORN.**(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY, INCOMPLETE PDF, ATTY REFILED SEE DOCUMENT #12 )**. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Simona Agnolucci)(LEE, MARK) Modified on 2/22/2021 (tjd).
February 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by DARREN BJORN of Pre-Hearing Memorandum (LEE, MARK)
February 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK M. LEE on behalf of DARREN BJORN with Certificate of Service(LEE, MARK)
February 17, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to MOTION HEARING SET FOR 2/24/2021 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY. (jaa, )
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED THAT THE DEFENDANT AND THE THIRD-PARTY WITNESS ARE GRANTED LEAVE TO RESPOND TO THE PENDING MOTION TO COMPEL IN NO. 17-3523 WITH A MEMORANDUM NOT EXCEEDING SEVEN PAGES FILED NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 22, 2021; THE PARTIES SHALL NOT FILE REPLY MEMORANDA IN EITHER MATTER AND WE WILL HOLD A HEARING ON THEN-PENDING MOTIONS IN BOTH MISC. NO. 21-13 AND NO. 17-3523 ON FEBRUARY 24, 2021 AT 9:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 13B AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/17/21. 2/17/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:21-mc-09005. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: It is ORDERED that Plaintiffs-Relators' Motion to Compel Compliance with Third Party Subpoena (Doc. #1) is TRANSFERRED forthwith to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for consideration by the Honorable Mark Kearney, in coordination with the related litigation, Case No. 17-cv-03523-MAK. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case once transfer is completed and terminate the pending motion. Signed on 2/17/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 2/17/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 Amended RETURN OF SERVICE (non cmp) re #3 Notice of filing. (Protzman, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 2/17/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Declaration of Bruce Parke In Support of Pltfs MTC Compliance by Kimberly Groome, Chris Purcell re #1 MOTION to compel Compliance with 3rd Party Subpoena (Protzman, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 2/17/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 SUGGESTIONS in support re #1 MOTION to compel Compliance with 3rd Party Subpoena filed by Andrew B Protzman on behalf of Plaintiffs Kimberly Groome, Chris Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Protzman, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 2/17/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to compel Compliance with 3rd Party Subpoena filed by Andrew B Protzman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/25/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Protzman, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 2/17/2021.]
February 11, 2021 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATED by Andrew B Protzman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. See motion immediately following this entry for details. This is a text entry only. No document is attached. Filing fee $49, receipt number AMOWDC-7281976.(Protzman, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 2/17/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Groome et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY GROOME
Represented By: ANDREW B. PROTZMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIS PURCELL
Represented By: ANDREW B. PROTZMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DARREN BJORN
Represented By: MARK M. LEE
Represented By: SIMONA A. AGNOLUCCI
Represented By: CAROLINE S. CHOI
Represented By: JOSHUA ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?