BAELZ v. STATE FARM INSURANCE, CO.
Plaintiff: JEAN BAELZ
Defendant: STATE FARM INSURANCE, CO.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00034
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4053 Breach of Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b) BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 02/24/2022. 02/24/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw)
February 22, 2022 Filing 8 Letter dated 02/22/2022 by JEAN BAELZ. (HYDER, ALEXANDER)
February 16, 2022 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE Pretrial / Rule 16 Video Conference held on 2/16/22 (bw)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON OR BEFORE 2/23/2022. ALL FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 5/17/2022. ANY DISCOVERY DEPOSITIONS DUE BY 6/28/2022., ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 7/12/2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 2/16/22. 2/16/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26(F) MEETING AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN by STATE FARM INSURANCE, CO.. (DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) Modified on 2/11/2022 (tjd).
February 1, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/16/2022 04:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. THE PARTIES SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE ZOOM INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER, #2 JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26 F.)(amw)
February 1, 2022 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Complaint upon State Farm by Certified Mail on 01/19/2022 (HYDER, ALEXANDER)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE COLE DOUGLAS on behalf of STATE FARM INSURANCE, CO. (DOUGLAS, KATHERINE)
January 7, 2022 Summons Issued as to STATE FARM INSURANCE, CO.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 1/7/22 (bw, )
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT JEAN BAELZ against STATE FARM INSURANCE, CO. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15645033.), filed by JEAN BAELZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(HYDER, ALEXANDER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAELZ v. STATE FARM INSURANCE, CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN BAELZ
Represented By: ALEXANDER C. HYDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM INSURANCE, CO.
Represented By: KATHERINE COLE DOUGLAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?