COOPER v. PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: MICHAEL COOPER
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY and PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2022cv00046
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Filing 13 Arbitration Procedural Order 02/02/2022 Entered and copies e-mailed.(sah)
February 2, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: VIRTUAL ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 5/24/2022 10:00 AM.(sah)
February 2, 2022 Filing 11 Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Videoconference(CARTER, BETH)
February 1, 2022 Filing 10 CONSENT to Arbitration by MICHAEL COOPER(GILLMAN, JEFFREY)
January 25, 2022 Filing 9 Notice Re: Arbitration Videoconference (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(mcos, )
January 24, 2022 Filing 8 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (sg)
January 21, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by JEFFREY S. GILLMAN on behalf of MICHAEL COOPER(GILLMAN, JEFFREY)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT "PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY" IS SUBSTITUTED FOR "PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY" IN THE CAPTION AS WELL AS THROUGHOUT THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 1/18/22. 1/18/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
January 18, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(CARTER, BETH) Modified on 1/19/2022 (md).
January 18, 2022 Filing 4 STIPULATION to amend complaint by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY. (CARTER, BETH)
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including The Progressive Corporation by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY.(CARTER, BETH)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15646618), filed by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY.(CARTER, BETH) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/7/2022) (sbt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOPER v. PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL COOPER
Represented By: JEFFREY S. GILLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BETH A. CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BETH A. CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?