LAMBERT v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al
Plaintiff: PEGGY LAMBERT
Defendant: MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP., JOHN DOE, JANE DOE and XYZ CORP
Case Number: 2:2022cv00058
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PEGGY LAMBERT. MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. (SADAKA, MARK)
February 16, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PEGGY LAMBERT. MERCK & CO., INC. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. (SADAKA, MARK)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by DINO S. SANGIAMO on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. with Certificate of Service(SANGIAMO, DINO)
January 10, 2022 Summons Issued as to MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 1/10/22 (amas, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP., XYZ CORP ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15648424.), filed by PEGGY LAMBERT. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(SADAKA, MARK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAMBERT v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEGGY LAMBERT
Represented By: MARK T. SADAKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK & CO., INC.
Represented By: DINO S. SANGIAMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Represented By: DINO S. SANGIAMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?