Church v. Kijakazi,Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mary Church
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi,Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2022cv00337
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAMELA A CARLOS
Referring Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2022 Filing 10 Social Security Administrative Record . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Court transcript index, #2 Appendix Documents related to administrative process including transcript of oral hearing, if applicable, #3 Appendix Payment documents and decisions, #4 Appendix Jurisdictional documents and notices, #5 Appendix Non disability related development, #6 Appendix Disability related development, #7 Appendix Medical Records)(LYNCH, ANDREW)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE PAMELA A. CARLOS, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 3/8/22. 3/8/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS TO DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/1/22. 2/1/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
January 27, 2022 Filing 7 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by Mary Church.. (MANNICCI, LORI)
January 27, 2022 Filing 6 Procedural Order together with Supplemental Orders 1/27/22 Entered and copies e-mailed. (dt)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF 1/27/22 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (DOC.2) AND COMPLAINT (DOC. 1), IT IS ORDERED THAT LEAVE TOPROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE (DOC.3) IS GRANTED.THE CLERKOF COURT SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FRCP 4(i) BY ELECTRONIC MEANS VIA THE COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM. ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: PAMELA A. CARLOS ON 1/27/22. 1/27/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
January 27, 2022 Filing 4 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(JL)
January 27, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Service Alternative filed by Mary Church..(MANNICCI, LORI)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mary Church.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MANNICCI, LORI)
January 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi,Acting Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Mary Church. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(MANNICCI, LORI)
January 27, 2022 Summons issued electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Acceptance of Service Agreement dated July 6, 2020. (dt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Church v. Kijakazi,Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Church
Represented By: LORI L. MANNICCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi,Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: ANDREW C. LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?