STOKES v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Plaintiff: WILLIE STOKES
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, NICOLE BRONGO KIWA NICOLE FORD, LAWRENCE GERRARD, ROBERT J MARANO and JOHN DIDONATO
Case Number: 2:2022cv00338
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by JOHN DIDONATO.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(TURNER, MICHAEL)
March 24, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman re: served Complaint and Summons upon Kelly A. Rycek, Exec. for Estate of Det. Lawrence Gerrard by Personal Service on 03/21/22 (VAN NAARDEN, JOSHUA)
March 18, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael Doyle re: served Complaint and Summons upon Robert J. Marano, Esquire by Personal Service on 03/17/22 (VAN NAARDEN, JOSHUA)
March 18, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Tom Fredericks re: served Complaint and Summons upon Nicole B. Ford, Executrix for the Estate of Det. Ernest Gilbert by Personal Service on 03/12/22 (VAN NAARDEN, JOSHUA)
March 17, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by SHELLEY R. SMITH on behalf of ROBERT J MARANO with Certificate of Service(SMITH, SHELLEY)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WILLIE STOKES. JOHN DIDONATO waiver sent on 2/3/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. (VAN NAARDEN, JOSHUA)
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WILLIE STOKES. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA waiver sent on 2/3/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. (VAN NAARDEN, JOSHUA)
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL L. TURNER on behalf of JOHN DIDONATO (TURNER, MICHAEL)
January 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15688917.), filed by WILLIE STOKES.(VAN NAARDEN, JOSHUA)
January 27, 2022 Summons Issued as to CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, JOHN DIDONATO, NICOLE BRONGO KIWA NICOLE FORD, LAWRENCE GERRARD, ROBERT J MARANO. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 1/27/22 (amas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STOKES v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE STOKES
Represented By: JOSHUA RYAN VAN NAARDEN
Represented By: JULIA R. RONNEBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICOLE BRONGO KIWA NICOLE FORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE GERRARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT J MARANO
Represented By: SHELLEY R. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DIDONATO
Represented By: MICHAEL L. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?