CARLA CAIN v. CINDY BASS
Plaintiff: CARLA CAIN
Defendant: CINDY BASS
Case Number: 2:2022cv00360
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT CINDY BASS SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 4/6/22. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/10/22. 3/11/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
March 9, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Attorney) filed by CINDY BASS.Memorandum.(SMITH, DAVID)
March 9, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by LAYAL A. ISSA on behalf of CINDY BASS (ISSA, LAYAL)
March 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID SMITH on behalf of CINDY BASS (SMITH, DAVID)
February 15, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARLA CAIN re: Brian Zavodrick PCS/Server - Process Plus Legal Services served Summons and Complaint upon CINDY BASS by Personal. CINDY BASS served on 2/13/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (MARTIN, AARON)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6),(e) OR (f) SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTER. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST 7 DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/28/22. 1/28/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
January 28, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN S. CARNES, JR on behalf of CARLA CAIN (CARNES, JOHN)
January 28, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN S. CARNES, JR on behalf of CINDY BASS (CARNES, JOHN) Modified on 1/28/2022 (lvj).(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; WILL RE-FILE DOCUMENT)
January 28, 2022 Summons Issued as to CINDY BASS. E-mailed to counsel on 1/28/22 (mbh, )
January 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CINDY BASS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15690685.), filed by CARLA CAIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Designation Form)(MARTIN, AARON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARLA CAIN v. CINDY BASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLA CAIN
Represented By: AARON D. MARTIN
Represented By: JOHN S. CARNES, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CINDY BASS
Represented By: DAVID SMITH
Represented By: LAYAL A. ISSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?