I.B.I.D. ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP v. GAUTHIER et al
Plaintiff: I.B.I.D. ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP doing business as I.B.I.D. ASSOCIATES, L.P.
Defendant: COUNCILMEMBER JAMIE GAUTHIER and THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Case Number: 2:2022cv00954
Filed: March 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JAMIE GAUTHIER, THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (TRO Hearing Transcript), #2 Certificate of Service)(PFAUTZ, MICHAEL)
May 6, 2022 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Compel filed by I.B.I.D. ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. (MCDONALD, MICHAEL)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 5/06/2022. 5/06/2022 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja)
May 6, 2022 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by I.B.I.D. ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order)(MCDONALD, MICHAEL)
May 3, 2022 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Compel filed by JAMIE GAUTHIER, THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Opposition and Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(KIRBY, AMY)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING REQUEST NOS. 1 AND 2 OF #19 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO ITS REVISED FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA SHALL FILE A RESPONSIVE BRIEF CONCERNING REQUEST NUMBER 3, NOT TO EXCEED 10 PAGES OR 3,500 WORDS, ON OR BEFORE MAY 3, 2022. I.B.I.D. MAY FILE A REPLY, SUBJECT TO THE SAME PAGE CONSTRAINTS, ON OR BEFORE MAY 6, 2022. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 4/27/2022. 4/27/2022 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja)
April 26, 2022 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by I.B.I.D. ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. (PITTINSKY, DAVID)
April 26, 2022 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON Telephone Conference held on 4/26/22 (JL)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT UPON RECEIPT OF PLAINTIFF I.B.I.D.S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO ITS REVISED FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS #19 , IT IS ORDERED THAT THE COURT WILLHOLD A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE WITH COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION ON TUESDAY, APRIL 26, 2022 AT 11:00 A.M. THE COURT WILL PROVIDE DIAL-IN INFORMATION TO THE PARTIES PRIOR TO THE CALL. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 4/22/22. 4/22/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
April 22, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Compel filed by I.B.I.D. ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP.Memorandum and Certificate of Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Responses to First Requests, #4 Exhibit Responses to Revised Requests)(MCDONALD, MICHAEL)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A RESPONSE BY 4/26/2022 TO #17 DEFENDANTS' FIRST MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, AND DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO ITS MOTION TO DISMISS BY 5/09/2022. THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR FOR A HEARING ON #2 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SCHEDULED FOR 6/1/2022 AT 9:30 AM IN Courtroom 3B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 4/14/2022. 4/14/2022 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja)
April 6, 2022 Filing 17 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JAMIE GAUTHIER, THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Declaration Certificate of Conferral)(KIRBY, AMY)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING #2 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, FOR THE REASONS GIVEN ON THE RECORD IN OPEN COURT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, PURSUANT TO THE PARTIES' AGREEMENT DISCLOSED ON THE RECORD, DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UNTIL APRIL 6, 2022. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 3/30/2022.3/30/2022 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja)
March 29, 2022 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON Motion Hearing held on 3/29/22 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by I.B.I.D. ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP Court Reporter: KIM HALEY. (JL)
March 25, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by I.B.I.D. ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. (PITTINSKY, DAVID)
March 23, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Proposed Order, Motion and Certificate of Service filed by JAMIE GAUTHIER, THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief In Opposition, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A-1,700 Units of Housing Are Set to Vanish, #5 Exhibit B-Census Median Rent Change, #6 Exhibit C-Danger of the Opt-Out, #7 Exhibit D-Safety Net Use of Vouchers, #8 Exhibit E-Geography of Affordable Housing, #9 Exhibit F-Legislative History Website)(KIRBY, AMY)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL NOT EXCEED THIRTY PAGES, INCLUDING SIGNATURE BLOCK, IN ITS BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 3/22/2022. 3/22/2022 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT, THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR FOR A HEARING ON #2 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ON MAY 12, 2022 AT 9:30 AM, IN COURTROOM 3B, BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON. NO LATER THAN 12:00 PM ON 5/10/2022, EACH PARTY SHALL FILE A PRE-HEARING MEMORANDUM SETTING FORTH THE (1) IDENTITY OF EACH FACT WITNESS WITH STATEMENT OF NATURE AND SUBSTANCE OF WITNESS'S EXPECTED TESTIMONY; (2) IDENTITY OF ANY EXPERT WITNESSES WITH SUMMARY OF EXPERTS' OPINION; AND (3) LIST OF EXHIBITS EACH PARTY EXPECTS TO OFFER AT HEARING. NO LATER THAN 12:00 PM ON 5/11/2022, THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT TO THE COURT ALL EXHIBITS THAT THE PARTIES INTEND TO USE AT THE HEARING. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 3/17/2022. 3/17/2022 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja) Modified on 3/17/2022 (ja).
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT, A HEARING, ON #2 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, IS SCHEDULED FOR MARCH, 29, 2022 AT 2:00 PM, IN COURTROOM 3B, BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON. DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO THE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SHALL BE FILED BY 3/23/2022, AND PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION SHALL BE FILED BY 3/25/2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL MEET AND CONFER AND SUBMIT TO THE COURT BY 5 PM. EDT ON 3/16/2022, VIA EMAIL TO CHAMBERS_OF_JUDGE_WOLSON@PAED.USCOURTS.GOV, A JOINT LETTER SETTING FORTH THE INFORMATION AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 3/15/2022. 3/15/2022 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja)
March 15, 2022 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON Telephone Conference held on 3/14/22 (JL)
March 14, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by I.B.I.D. ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP re #1 Complaint (Attorney), #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (PITTINSKY, DAVID)
March 14, 2022 Filing 7 EXHIBIT Designation Form by I.B.I.D. ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP.. (PITTINSKY, DAVID)
March 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL WU-KUNG PFAUTZ on behalf of JAMIE GAUTHIER, THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA with Certificate of Service(PFAUTZ, MICHAEL)
March 14, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY MARIE KIRBY on behalf of JAMIE GAUTHIER, THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA with Certificate of Service(KIRBY, AMY)
March 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL R. MCDONALD on behalf of I.B.I.D. ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (MCDONALD, MICHAEL)
March 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID H. PITTINSKY on behalf of I.B.I.D. ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (PITTINSKY, DAVID)
March 14, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by I.B.I.D. ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP.Memorandum.(WELSH, HANNAH)
March 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15784502.), filed by I.B.I.D. ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Appendix)(WELSH, HANNAH)
March 14, 2022 Summons Issued as to JAMIE GAUTHIER, THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 3/14/22 (bw)
March 14, 2022 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file Completed Designation Form in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (sbt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: I.B.I.D. ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP v. GAUTHIER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.B.I.D. ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP doing business as I.B.I.D. ASSOCIATES, L.P.
Represented By: DAVID H. PITTINSKY
Represented By: MICHAEL R. MCDONALD
Represented By: HANNAH L. WELSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNCILMEMBER JAMIE GAUTHIER
Represented By: AMY MARIE KIRBY
Represented By: MICHAEL WU-KUNG PFAUTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: AMY MARIE KIRBY
Represented By: MICHAEL WU-KUNG PFAUTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?