MOLDAVSKY v. KIJAKAZI
Plaintiff: OLEG MOLDAVSKY
Defendant: Comm'r of SSA KILOLO KIJAKAZI and KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Case Number: 2:2022cv01447
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAMELA A CARLOS
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 Filing 7 Social Security Administrative Record . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Court transcript index, #2 Appendix Documents related to administrative process including transcript of oral hearing, if applicable, #3 Appendix Payment documents and decisions, #4 Appendix Jurisdictional documents and notices, #5 Appendix Non disability related development, #6 Appendix Disability related development, #7 Appendix Medical Records)(LYNCH, ANDREW)
April 15, 2022 Filing 6 Social Security Magistrate Consent by OLEG MOLDAVSKY.. (SUTTON, THOMAS)
April 14, 2022 Filing 5 Procedural Order together with Supplemental Orders 4/14/22 Entered and copies e-mailed. (dt)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF 4/14/22 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (DOC.NO. 2), AND COMPLAINT(DOC.NO.1), IT IS ORDERED THAT: LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONS AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FRCP 4(i) BY ELECTRONIC MEANS VIA THE COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT/ELECTRONIC CASE FILES SYSTEM ("CM/ECF") UPON; THE OFFICE OF THE REGIONAL CHIEF COUNSEL, REGION III, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTATION; THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND THE U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL. THE CLERK'S OFFICE WILL ENSURE THAT CM/ECF NOTIFICATIONS INDICATING THAT THE COMPLAINT HAS BEE FILED, AND SUMMONS HAVE BEEN ISSUED.ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: PAMELA A. CARLOS ON 4/14/22. 4/14/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
April 14, 2022 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(JL)
April 14, 2022 Summons issued electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Acceptance of Service Agreement dated July 6, 2020. (dt)
April 13, 2022 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by OLEG MOLDAVSKY..(SUTTON, THOMAS)
April 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KILOLO KIJAKAZI, filed by OLEG MOLDAVSKY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(SUTTON, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOLDAVSKY v. KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLEG MOLDAVSKY
Represented By: THOMAS D. SUTTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comm'r of SSA KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Represented By: ANDREW C. LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?