ANTANAVICA v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al
Plaintiff: JUDITH ANTANAVICA
Defendant: MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP., JOHN DOE, JANE DOE and XYZ CORP
Case Number: 2:2022cv01678
Filed: April 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JUDITH ANTANAVICA. MERCK & CO., INC. waiver sent on 5/10/2022, answer due 7/11/2022. (SADAKA, MARK)
June 7, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JUDITH ANTANAVICA. MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. waiver sent on 5/10/2022, answer due 7/11/2022. (SADAKA, MARK)
May 2, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DINO S. SANGIAMO on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. with Certificate of Service(SANGIAMO, DINO)
May 2, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (amas)
April 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15891288.), filed by JUDITH ANTANAVICA. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(SADAKA, MARK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANTANAVICA v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDITH ANTANAVICA
Represented By: MARK T. SADAKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK & CO., INC.
Represented By: DINO S. SANGIAMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Represented By: DINO S. SANGIAMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?