UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. AMERICAN HEALTH FOUNDATION INC. et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: AMERICAN HEALTH FOUNDATION INC., AHF MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, AHF MONTGOMERY INC. D/B/A CHELTENHAM NURSING AND REHAB CENTER, AHF OHIO INC. D/B/A THE SANCTUARY AT WILMINGTON PLACE, AHF MONTGOMERY INC. doing business as CHELTENHAM NURSING AND REHABILITATION CENTER, AHF OHIO INC. doing business as THE SANCTUARY AT WILMINGTON PLACE doing business as SAMARITAN CARE CENTER AND VILLA and SAMARITAN CARE CENTER AND VILLA
Case Number: 2:2022cv02344
Filed: June 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: R BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS LETTER REQUEST DATED JULY 14, 2022, FOR A 60-DAY EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT #16 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE REQUEST IS GRANTED. RESPONSES TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT ARE DUE NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 14, 2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 8/10/22. 8/10/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER #4 , IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THIS ORDER SHALL APPLY TO ECF NOS. 1-1 AND 2-1; AND PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(E)(2), AND GOOD CAUSE HAVING BEEN SHOWN, THESE DOCUMENTS ARE SEALED, AND NONPARTIES ARE PROHIBITED FROM ACCESSING THEM REMOTELY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 7/28/22.7/29/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
July 14, 2022 Filing 16 Letter dated 07/14/2022 by AHF MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, AHF MONTGOMERY INC., AHF OHIO INC., AMERICAN HEALTH FOUNDATION INC.. (LINK, JOSHUA)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT THE #13 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE FOR, MICHAEL J. FERRARA IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 7/8/22.7/8/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THE #12 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE FOR PATRICK M. HAGAN, IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 7/8/22.7/8/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
July 7, 2022 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael J. Ferrara ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16029330.) filed by AHF MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, AHF MONTGOMERY INC., AHF OHIO INC., AMERICAN HEALTH FOUNDATION INC..Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Joshua M. Link, Esq., #3 Exhibit A - Application of Michael J. Ferrara for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(LINK, JOSHUA)
July 7, 2022 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Patrick M. Hagan ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16029236.) filed by AHF MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, AHF MONTGOMERY INC., AHF OHIO INC., AMERICAN HEALTH FOUNDATION INC..Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Joshua M. Link, Esq., #3 Exhibit A - Application of Patrick M. Hagan for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(LINK, JOSHUA)
July 7, 2022 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AHF OHIO INC..(LINK, JOSHUA)
July 7, 2022 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AHF MONTGOMERY INC..(LINK, JOSHUA)
July 7, 2022 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AHF MANAGEMENT CORPORATION.(LINK, JOSHUA)
July 7, 2022 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AMERICAN HEALTH FOUNDATION INC..(LINK, JOSHUA)
July 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA M. LINK on behalf of AHF MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, AHF MONTGOMERY INC., AHF OHIO INC., AMERICAN HEALTH FOUNDATION INC. with Certificate of Service(LINK, JOSHUA)
June 21, 2022 Filing 6 Summons as to Amended Complaint Issued as to AHF MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, AHF MONTGOMERY INC., AHF OHIO INC., AMERICAN HEALTH FOUNDATION INC.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 6/21/22 (bw)
June 17, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against AHF MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, AHF MONTGOMERY INC., AHF OHIO INC., AMERICAN HEALTH FOUNDATION INC., filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Attachment A), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form)(Young, Benjamin)
June 17, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Protective Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Benjamin)
June 17, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AHF MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, AHF MONTGOMERY INC., AHF OHIO INC., AMERICAN HEALTH FOUNDATION INC., SAMARITAN CARE CENTER AND VILLA. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 6/17/22 (bw)
June 15, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against AHF MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, AHF MONTGOMERY INC., AHF OHIO INC., AMERICAN HEALTH FOUNDATION INC., filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Attachment A), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form (Corrected), #4 Case Management Track Form)(Young, Benjamin)
June 15, 2022 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED Designation Form in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (sbt)
June 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AHF MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, AHF MONTGOMERY INC., AHF OHIO INC., AMERICAN HEALTH FOUNDATION INC., SAMARITAN CARE CENTER AND VILLA, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form)(Young, Benjamin) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/15/2022) (sbt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. AMERICAN HEALTH FOUNDATION INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Benjamin S Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN HEALTH FOUNDATION INC.
Represented By: JOSHUA M. LINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHF MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSHUA M. LINK
Represented By: MICHAEL J. FERRARA
Represented By: PATRICK M. HAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHF MONTGOMERY INC. D/B/A CHELTENHAM NURSING AND REHAB CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHF OHIO INC. D/B/A THE SANCTUARY AT WILMINGTON PLACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHF MONTGOMERY INC. doing business as CHELTENHAM NURSING AND REHABILITATION CENTER
Represented By: JOSHUA M. LINK
Represented By: MICHAEL J. FERRARA
Represented By: PATRICK M. HAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHF OHIO INC. doing business as THE SANCTUARY AT WILMINGTON PLACE doing business as SAMARITAN CARE CENTER AND VILLA
Represented By: JOSHUA M. LINK
Represented By: MICHAEL J. FERRARA
Represented By: PATRICK M. HAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMARITAN CARE CENTER AND VILLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?