Giddings v. Bobbi Jo
Petitioner: Gregory Giddings
Respondent: Salamon Bobbi Jo, BOBBIE JO SALAMON and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 2:2022cv02388
Filed: June 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAMELA A CARLOS
Referring Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Filing 5 Receipt of State Court Record on 7/26/22, sent from Kevin Eibel, Clerk's Office to Judge Carlos' Chambers. (dt)
July 21, 2022 State Court Record received and forwarded to Judge Carlos' Chambers. (ke)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PETITIONERS MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE A BRIEF IN SUPPORT (ECF NO. #2 ) IS GRANTED. PETITIONER MAY FILE A SUPPORTING LEGAL MEMORANDUM NO LATER THAN AUGUST 29, 2022. THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY SHALL FILE A SPECIFIC AND DETAILED ANSWER TO THE CLAIMS IN THE HABEAS PETITION AND A SUPPORTING LEGAL MEMORANDUM, WITHIN FORTY-FIVE (45) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF SERVICE OF THE PETITIONERS MEMORANDUM, PURSUANT TO RULE 5 FOL. 28 U.S.C. 2254. ALL STATE COURT OPINIONS AND RELEVANT RECORDS MUST BE ATTACHED AS EXHIBITS. THE CLERK FOR THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY SHALL FILE WITH THE CLERK OF THIS COURT COPIES OF ALL RECORDS, INCLUDING TRANSCRIPTS OF NOTES OF TESTIMONY AT ARRAIGNMENT, TRIAL, SENTENCING, SUPPRESSION HEARINGS, AND POST-CONVICTION HEARINGS, PETITIONS, PLEADINGS, OPINIONS, AND BRIEFS OF STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS IN THE MATTER OF COMMONWEALTH V. GIDDINGS, COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, CP-51-CR-15079-2012, WITHIN FORTY-FIVE (45) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF SERVICE OF THE ANSWER. AS REQUIRED BY 18 U.S.C. 3771(B)(2), THE COMMONWEALTH SHALL ENSURE THAT IN A FEDERAL HABEAS CORPUS PROCEEDING ARISING OUT OF A STATE CONVICTION, ANY CRIME VICTIMS ARE AFFORDED THEIR RIGHTS UNDER THE CRIME VICTIMS ACT, AS AMENDED JULY 27, 2006 PRISONER STATE RECORD DUE BY 7/29/2022.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS ON 6/29/22. 6/29/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas) Modified on 7/8/2022 (lvj).
June 29, 2022 Copies of Docs. 3 and 4 and Petiton and docket sheet emailed to DA of Philadelphia County and Attorney General of PA. (mas)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE PAMELA A. CARLOS, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 72.1.IV(C), ALL ISSUES AND EVIDENCE SHALL BE PRESENTED TO THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND THAT NEW ISSUES AND EVIDENCE SHALL NOT BE RAISED AFTER THE FILING OF THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION IF THEY COULD HAVE BEEN PRESENTED TO THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; AND THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO PROVIDE THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE AND THE PENNSYLVANIA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL WITH A COPY OF THE PETITION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/28/22. 6/29/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO PHILADELPHIA COUNTY D.A. OFFICE AND PA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL.(mas)
June 22, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION Permission to File Brief in Support filed by Gregory Giddings.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WISEMAN, MICHAEL)
June 17, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number APAEDC-15990052.), filed by Gregory Giddings.(WISEMAN, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giddings v. Bobbi Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory Giddings
Represented By: MICHAEL WISEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Salamon Bobbi Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BOBBIE JO SALAMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?