CHECKERS DRIVE-IN RESTAURANTS INC. v. 2008 W OREGON AVE LLC et al
Plaintiff: CHECKERS DRIVE IN RESTAURANTS INC. and CHECKERS DRIVE-IN RESTAURANTS, INC.
Defendant: 2008 W OREGON AVE LLC, SRI DEVADEVA LLC, SHRI GIRIJATMAJ LLC, SHRI SIDDHATEK LLC, SHRI MAYURESHWAR LLC, SHRI BALLALESHWAR LLC and SHRI VARADAVINAYAK LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv02399
Filed: June 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 7/8/2022. 7/8/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
June 21, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 2008 W OREGON AVE LLC, SHRI BALLALESHWAR LLC, SHRI GIRIJATMAJ LLC, SHRI MAYURESHWAR LLC, SHRI SIDDHATEK LLC, SHRI VARADAVINAYAK LLC, SRI DEVADEVA LLC. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 6/21/2022 (sg)
June 17, 2022 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CHECKERS DRIVE IN RESTAURANTS INC..(DEFEO, MARISA)
June 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 2008 W OREGON AVE LLC, SHRI BALLALESHWAR LLC, SHRI GIRIJATMAJ LLC, SHRI MAYURESHWAR LLC, SHRI SIDDHATEK LLC, SRI DEVADEVA LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15990573.), filed by CHECKERS DRIVE IN RESTAURANTS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Exhibit A through E, #5 Exhibit F through J, #6 Exhibit K through O, #7 Exhibit P through T, #8 Exhibit UVW)(DEFEO, MARISA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHECKERS DRIVE-IN RESTAURANTS INC. v. 2008 W OREGON AVE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHECKERS DRIVE IN RESTAURANTS INC.
Represented By: MARISA RACHEL DEFEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHECKERS DRIVE-IN RESTAURANTS, INC.
Represented By: MARISA RACHEL DEFEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2008 W OREGON AVE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRI DEVADEVA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHRI GIRIJATMAJ LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHRI SIDDHATEK LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHRI MAYURESHWAR LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHRI BALLALESHWAR LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHRI VARADAVINAYAK LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?