BROWN v. FARRELL
Petitioner: NASIR BROWN
Respondent: MICHELLE FARRELL and THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA
Case Number: 2:2022cv02453
Filed: June 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD A MCHUGH
Referring Judge: CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 COPY OF PETITION #2 , ORDER #6 AND DOCKET SHEET FORWARDED BY EMAIL TO DA PHILADELPHIA COUNTY ON 7/27/22. (jaa, )
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED THAT THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA IS ADDED AS A PARTY RESPONDENT AND THE CAPTION IS HEREBY SO AMENDED. 2. THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY SHALL FILE SPECIFIC AND DETAILED ANSWERS WITHIN FORTY-FIVE (45) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 5, 28 U.S.C. FOL. 2254. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 7/27/22. 7/27/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PETITIONER AND E-MAILED TO DA OF PHILADELPHIA.(jaa, )
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HON. CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS, U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 7/5/22. Motions referred to CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. 7/6/22 ENTERED & MAILED TO BROWN. ORDER & PETITION #2 E-MAILED TO PHILA. COUNTY D.A.'S OFFICE AND PA OFFICE OF ATTY. GENERAL. (fdc)
June 24, 2022 COPY OF DOC. NO. 4 HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE. (bw)
June 17, 2022 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jaa, ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/23/2022) (jaa, ).
June 17, 2022 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by NASIR BROWN. (jaa, )
June 17, 2022 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by NASIR BROWN. *IFP PENDING. (jaa, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/23/2022) (tjd).
June 17, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by NASIR BROWN.(jaa, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/23/2022) (tjd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. FARRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NASIR BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MICHELLE FARRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?