ECKER v. WYLIE et al
Plaintiff: REBECCA ECKER
Defendant: ROBERT WYLIE, MAVIS WYLIE and DORSHKA OSBECK
Case Number: 2:2022cv02548
Filed: June 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. #5 ) IS GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/16/22.8/16/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. ECKER SHALL RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS ON OR BEFORE 8/8/22. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO NOT ISSUE SUMMONS AT THIS TIME. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/1/22.8/1/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
August 1, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . RESPONSES DUE BY 8/8/2022. (amas)
July 14, 2022 Filing 6 Praecipe to Attach Exhibit "O" to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by DORSHKA OSBECK, MAVIS WYLIE, ROBERT WYLIE. (WEISGOLD, DEAN) Modified on 7/15/2022 (lvj).
July 12, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DORSHKA OSBECK, MAVIS WYLIE, ROBERT WYLIE.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit)(WEISGOLD, DEAN)
July 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DEAN E. WEISGOLD on behalf of DORSHKA OSBECK, MAVIS WYLIE, ROBERT WYLIE with Certificate of Service(WEISGOLD, DEAN)
June 30, 2022 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (amas)
June 30, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against DORSHKA OSBECK, MAVIS WYLIE, ROBERT WYLIE, filed by REBECCA ECKER.(amas)
June 30, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by REBECCA ECKER.(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ECKER v. WYLIE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA ECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT WYLIE
Represented By: DEAN E. WEISGOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAVIS WYLIE
Represented By: DEAN E. WEISGOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DORSHKA OSBECK
Represented By: DEAN E. WEISGOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?