BIGGS v. ARMEL et al
Petitioner: MARK BIGGS and SALADINE SWEETS
Respondent: ERIC ARMEL, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 2:2022cv02663
Filed: July 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M GALLAGHER
Referring Judge: CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2022 DOC. 8 MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME (DOCUMENT NO. 7) IS GRANTED; 2. ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 28, 2022, RESPONDENTS SHALL FILE THEIR BRIEFS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 8/31/22.9/1/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO PETITIONER. (jaa, )
August 30, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ERIC ARMEL, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS.(NAPIORSKI, DAVID)
July 25, 2022 Filing 6 Receipt of State Court Record on 7/21/22, sent from SUPERVISOR to DEPUTY CLERK TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. (jaa, )
July 21, 2022 State Court Record received and forwarded to Judge Wells. (ke)
July 15, 2022 DOC. NO. #5 MAILED TO PRO SE ON 7/15/22. (amas)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY SHALL FILE SPECIFIC AND DETAILED ANSWERS WITHIN FORTY-FIVE (45) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 5, 28 U.S.C. FOL. 2254. THE CLERK OF THE QUARTER SESSIONS COURT OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY SHALL FILE WITH THE CLERK OF THIS COURT COPIES OF ALL RECORDS, INCLUDING TRANSCRIPTS OF NOTES OF TESTIMONY AT ARRAIGNMENT, TRIAL, SENTENCING, SUPPRESSION HEARINGS, POST-CONVICTION HEARINGS, PETITIONS, PLEADINGS, OPINIONS AND BRIEFS OF STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS IN THE MATTER OF COMMONWEALTH V. BIGGS, COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA, CP-51-CR-0015926-2013, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 7/14/22. 7/14/22 ENTERED. PRO SE PETITIONER NOT MAILED. (va)
July 14, 2022 Copy of #5 Order & #1 Petition emailed to PA Atty Gen & Phila DA on 7/14/22. (va)
July 14, 2022 Copy of #5 Order faxed to CCP Philadelphia on 7/14/22. (va)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 72.1.IV(C), ALL ISSUES AND EVIDENCE SHALL BE PRESENTED TO THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND THAT NEW ISSUES AND EVIDENCE SHALL NOT BE RAISED AFTER THE FILING OF THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION IF THEY COULD HAVE BEEN PRESENTED TO THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; AND THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO PROVIDE THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE AND THE PENNSYLVANIA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL WITH A COPY OF THE PETITION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 7/11/22. 7/11/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED TO THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE AND THE PENNSYLVANIA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL WITH A COPY OF THE PETITION.(mas)
July 11, 2022 DOC. 3 MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg)
July 6, 2022 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number PPE241507 (mbh)
July 5, 2022 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (mbh)
July 5, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED BY MARK BIGGS.(mbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BIGGS v. ARMEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARK BIGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SALADINE SWEETS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ERIC ARMEL
Represented By: DAVID NAPIORSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: DAVID NAPIORSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: DAVID NAPIORSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?