WALTON v. THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION AND PAROLE
Petitioner: TERRELL WALTON
Respondent: THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION AND PAROLE
Case Number: 2:2022cv02860
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2022 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #7 TO PETITIONER ON 8/24/22. (jaa, )
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. WALTON'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED AS MOOT. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TERMINATE THE CASE. THERE IS NO CAUSE TO ISSUE A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 8/15/22. 8/23/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh)
August 5, 2022 Filing 6 Request by TERRELL WALTON. (mbh)
July 28, 2022 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by TERRELL WALTON. (mbh)
July 28, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPRIS FILED BY TERRELL WALTON.(mbh)
July 26, 2022 COPY OF DOC. NO. 3 AND HABEAS PETITION FORMS HAVE BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE. (bw)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND WALTON BLANK COPIES OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD FORM FOR FILING A PETITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2254 BEARING THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. IF WALTON INTENDS TO PURSUE THIS MATTER, HE SHALL COMPLETE THIS COURT'S STANDARD FORM, SIGN THE COMPLETED PETITION AND RETURN IT TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IF WALTON FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FUTHER NOTICE FOR FAILUE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 7/22/22. 7/25/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh)
July 22, 2022 COPY OF DOC. NO. 2 HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE. (bw)
July 18, 2022 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw)
July 18, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.), filed by TERRELL WALTON.(bw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALTON v. THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION AND PAROLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TERRELL WALTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION AND PAROLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?