MASON v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: MELINDA SHAWN MASON
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 2:2022cv03141
Filed: August 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: SCOTT W REID
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2022 Filing 11 Social Security Administrative Record . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Court transcript index, #2 Appendix Documents related to administrative process including transcript of oral hearing, if applicable, #3 Appendix Payment documents and decisions, #4 Appendix Jurisdictional documents and notices, #5 Appendix Non disability related development, #6 Appendix Disability related development, #7 Appendix Medical Records)(LYNCH, ANDREW)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF EDWARD A. WICKLUND IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID ON 8/17/22. 8/18/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 17, 2022 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edward A. Wicklund by MELINDA SHAWN MASON.. (Parente, Andrea)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF EDWARD A. WICKLUND IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID ON 8/17/22. 8/17/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 12, 2022 Filing 7 Procedural Order together with Supplemental Orders 8/12/22 Entered and E-mailed. (fdc)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S #2 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT #1 IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FRCP 4(I) BY ELECTRONIC MEANS VIA THE COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT/ELECTRONIC CASE FILES SYSTEM ("CM/ECF"). SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID ON 8/12/22.8/12/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
August 12, 2022 Summons issued electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Acceptance of Service Agreement dated July 6, 2020. (fdc)
August 11, 2022 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edward A. Wicklund by MELINDA SHAWN MASON. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16104249.). (Parente, Andrea)
August 10, 2022 Filing 4 Social Security Magistrate Consent by MELINDA SHAWN MASON.. (Parente, Andrea)
August 8, 2022 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(rf, )
August 8, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by MELINDA SHAWN MASON.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parente, Andrea)
August 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by MELINDA SHAWN MASON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 USM-285 Forms, #6 USM-285 Forms, #7 USM-285 Forms, #8 Case Management Track Form, #9 Designation Form)(Parente, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MASON v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELINDA SHAWN MASON
Represented By: Andrea Parente
Represented By: EDWARD A. WICKLUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: ANDREW C. LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?