BUTLER v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Plaintiff: DAVID BUTLER
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION and NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 2:2022cv03375
Filed: August 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 10/6/22. 10/6/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/13/22 AT 10:00 AM IN BEFORE HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 9/30/22. 9/30/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 28, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK).(DOUGHERTY, STEPHEN)
September 28, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Attorney), to Extend time to Answer by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (DOUGHERTY, STEPHEN)
September 6, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Complaint and Summons upon AMTRAK by Certified Mail on 08/30/2022 (MYERS, ROBERT)
September 6, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD K. HOHN on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (HOHN, RICHARD)
September 6, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN DOUGHERTY on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (DOUGHERTY, STEPHEN)
August 24, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). E-mailed To: Robert E. Myers on 8/24/22 (fdc)
August 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16126362.), filed by DAVID BUTLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form case management track designation form, #3 Designation Form Designation form)(MYERS, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUTLER v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID BUTLER
Represented By: ROBERT E. MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Represented By: RICHARD K. HOHN
Represented By: STEPHEN DOUGHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?