BAPTISTE v. PFIZER, INC.
Plaintiff: TERESA BAPTISTE
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Case Number: 2:2022cv03647
Filed: September 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO REFILE ONCE THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION HAS DECIDED WHETHER TO INCLUDE THIS MATTER IN A MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION #6 MOTION TO TRANSFER BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 11/04/2022.11/04/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw)
October 31, 2022 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Transfer filed by PFIZER, INC.. (RAPPAPORT, NANCY)
October 24, 2022 Filing 7 Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Transfer filed by TERESA BAPTISTE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Declaration, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(FREIWALD, AARON)
October 6, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer filed by PFIZER, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(RAPPAPORT, NANCY)
October 6, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint together with and Affirmative Defenses by PFIZER, INC..(RAPPAPORT, NANCY)
October 6, 2022 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PFIZER, INC..(RAPPAPORT, NANCY)
October 6, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by NANCY SHANE RAPPAPORT on behalf of PFIZER, INC. with Certificate of Service(RAPPAPORT, NANCY)
September 14, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PFIZER, INC.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 9/14/22 (JL)
September 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PFIZER, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16168769.), filed by TERESA BAPTISTE.(FREIWALD, AARON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAPTISTE v. PFIZER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA BAPTISTE
Represented By: AARON J. FREIWALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Represented By: NANCY SHANE RAPPAPORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?