CAPERS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: KEYSHA MARIE CAPERS
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 2:2022cv03939
Filed: October 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH T HEY
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Filing 8 Social Security Administrative Record . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Court transcript index, #2 Appendix Documents related to administrative process including transcript of oral hearing, if applicable, #3 Appendix Payment documents and decisions, #4 Appendix Jurisdictional documents and notices, #5 Appendix Non disability related development, #6 Appendix Disability related development, #7 Appendix Medical Records, Part 1, #8 Appendix Medical Records, Part 2)(LYNCH, ANDREW)
October 5, 2022 Filing 7 Social Security Magistrate Consent by KEYSHA MARIE CAPERS.. (OSTERHOUT, KARL)
October 5, 2022 Summons issued electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Acceptance of Service Agreement dated July 6, 2020. (sg)
October 4, 2022 Filing 6 Procedural Order together with Supplemental Orders 10/5/2022 Entered and copies e-mailed. (sg) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/6/2022) (lisad, ).
October 4, 2022 Filing 5 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(sg) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/6/2022) (lisad, ).
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT upon consideration of Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 2) and the Complaint (Doc. 1), it is ORDERED that:1. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED.2. The Complaint is deemed filed.3. The Clerk of Court shall serve the summonses and the Complaint in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) by electronic means via the Courts Case Management/Electronic Case Files System (CM/ECF), upon: the Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region III, Social Security Administration; the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania; and the United States Attorney General.14. The Clerks Office will ensure that CM/ECF notifications indicating that the complaint has been filed, and summonses have been issued, are sent to ogc.edpa.complaints@ssa.gov and USAPAE.SSAComplaints@usdoj.gov. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 10/4/2022.10/5/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
October 4, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by KEYSHA MARIE CAPERS re Attorney Required Forms, Designation Form (OSTERHOUT, KARL)
October 4, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by KEYSHA MARIE CAPERS.. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Forms)(OSTERHOUT, KARL)
October 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KILOLO KIJAKAZI, filed by KEYSHA MARIE CAPERS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Summons)(OSTERHOUT, KARL)
October 4, 2022 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED Designation Form in this case using the Exhibit docket event; Related Case section is unsigned. (sbt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAPERS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEYSHA MARIE CAPERS
Represented By: KARL E. OSTERHOUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: ANDREW C. LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?