SAGNA v. CATAPULT HEALTH PA
Plaintiff: CHERITA SAGNA and Roger King
Defendant: CATAPULT HEALTH PA
Case Number: 2:2022cv03975
Filed: October 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: BERLE M SCHILLER
Nature of Suit: Labor Litigations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S #32 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 1/19/23.1/19/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 19, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order filed by CATAPULT HEALTH PA.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MCCARRON, TANNER)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT WITH REGARD TO THE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CORRECTIVE NOTICE (ECF #13-14) IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER WILL BE HELD ON WEDNESDAY, 2/22/23 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 13B. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 1/18/23. 1/18/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED BY SEVEN (7) DAYS, UNTIL 1/27/23. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 1/17/23. 1/17/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 12, 2023 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Roger King, CHERITA SAGNA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Emails, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(JOSEPHSON, MICHAEL)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER THAT #27 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 1/9/23.1/9/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 6, 2023 Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order and Corrective Notice filed by Roger King, CHERITA SAGNA.Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order and Corrective Notice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Reply ISO Motion for Protective Order and Corrective Notice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(JOSEPHSON, MICHAEL)
January 6, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) filed by CATAPULT HEALTH PA.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HANK, MATTHEW)
December 30, 2022 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Protective Order and Corrective Notice filed by CATAPULT HEALTH PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(HANK, MATTHEW)
December 29, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION for Protective Order filed by CATAPULT HEALTH PA.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(HANK, MATTHEW)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #21 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME UNTIL DECEMBER 30, 2022 TO FILE OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 12/27/2022; ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (jp)
December 23, 2022 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against CATAPULT HEALTH PA, filed by CHERITA SAGNA, Roger King.(JOSEPHSON, MICHAEL)
December 23, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Protective Order filed by CATAPULT HEALTH PA.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MCCARRON, TANNER)
December 21, 2022 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER. Re: A Status Conference was held by telephone on 12/21/22. (fdc)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL FILE AN OPPOSITION BRIEF TO PLAINTIFF'S #13 MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ON OR BEFORE WEDNESDAY, 12/28/22. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 12/21/22. 12/21/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S #16 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF RICHARD M. SCHREIBER, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 12/21/22.12/21/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S #15 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ANDREW W. DUNLAP, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 12/21/22.12/21/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
December 20, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Richard M. Schreiber ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16387037.) filed by CHERITA SAGNA.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Richard M. Schreiber, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(RODRIGUEZ, CAMILLE)
December 20, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Andrew W. Dunlap ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16387036.) filed by CHERITA SAGNA.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew W. Dunlap, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(RODRIGUEZ, CAMILLE)
December 19, 2022 Filing 14 Plaintiff's Brief and Statement of Issues in Support of Request for Review filed by CHERITA SAGNA.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(JOSEPHSON, MICHAEL)
December 19, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Protective Order and Corrective Notice filed by CHERITA SAGNA.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(JOSEPHSON, MICHAEL)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S #11 MOTION TO WITHDRAW TAYLOR S. MONTGOMERY, AS COUNSEL IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 11/9/22.11/9/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
November 8, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Taylor S. Montgomery filed by CHERITA SAGNA.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JOSEPHSON, MICHAEL)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS HEREBY STAYED SO THAT THE PARTIES MAY PROCEED WITH SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A JOINT STATUS REPORT BY 12/23/22; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 10/26/22. 10/26/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF TAYLOR S. MONTGOMERY, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 10/19/22. 10/19/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MICHAEL A. JOSEPHSON, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 10/19/22. 10/19/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
October 18, 2022 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Taylor S. Montgomery by CHERITA SAGNA. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16252466.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Taylor S. Montgomery)(RODRIGUEZ, CAMILLE)
October 18, 2022 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Josephson by CHERITA SAGNA. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16252453.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Michael A. Josephson)(RODRIGUEZ, CAMILLE)
October 13, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CATAPULT HEALTH PA.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HANK, MATTHEW)
October 12, 2022 Filing 4 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (jaa, ) (jp).
October 6, 2022 Filing 3 EXHIBIT Designation Form by CATAPULT HEALTH PA.. (MCCARRON, TANNER)
October 6, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by TANNER MCCARRON on behalf of CATAPULT HEALTH PA with Certificate of Service(MCCARRON, TANNER)
October 6, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CATAPULT HEALTH PA (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16225986), filed by CATAPULT HEALTH PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Designation Form)(HANK, MATTHEW)
October 6, 2022 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Defendant's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED Designation Form in this case using the Exhibit docket event. The Yes/No questions need to be answered in the Related Case section. (sbt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAGNA v. CATAPULT HEALTH PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERITA SAGNA
Represented By: CAMILLE RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: MICHAEL A. JOSEPHSON
Represented By: TAYLOR S. MONTGOMERY
Represented By: ANDREW W. DUNLAP
Represented By: RICHARD M. SCHREIBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger King
Represented By: MICHAEL A. JOSEPHSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATAPULT HEALTH PA
Represented By: TANNER MCCARRON
Represented By: MATTHEW J. HANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?