ROCKERS et al v. HAVERFORD TOWNSHIP et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Scott T Rockers, Mrs. Lindsey D Rockers, SCOTT T. ROCKERS and LINDSEY D. ROCKERS
Defendant: HAVERFORD TOWNSHIP and Haverford Township Zoning Hearing Board
Case Number: 2:2022cv04378
Filed: November 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 360
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, FILE THEIR RESPONSIVE PLEADING; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/27/22. 12/27/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
December 13, 2022 Filing 7 Response Letter in response to request for 12b6 conference by LINDSEY D. ROCKERS, SCOTT T. ROCKERS. (DEMARCO, RICHARD)
December 7, 2022 Filing 6 Letter dated December 7, 2022 by HAVERFORD TOWNSHIP, HAVERFORD TOWNSHIP ZONING HEARING BOARD. (MCDONOUGH, SUZANNE)
December 1, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by SUZANNE MCDONOUGH on behalf of HAVERFORD TOWNSHIP, HAVERFORD TOWNSHIP ZONING HEARING BOARD with jury demand, certificate of service(MCDONOUGH, SUZANNE)
November 23, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jonathan DiBello re: served Summons and complaint upon Defendants upon Receptionist by Personal service on 11/21/22 (DEMARCO, RICHARD)
November 3, 2022 Filing 3 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl)
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to HAVERFORD TOWNSHIP, HAVERFORD TOWNSHIP ZONING HEARING BOARD. (amas)
November 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HAVERFORD TOWNSHIP, Haverford Township Zoning Hearing Board ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16286191.), filed by Scott T Rockers, Lindsey D Rockers.(DEMARCO, RICHARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROCKERS et al v. HAVERFORD TOWNSHIP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Scott T Rockers
Represented By: RICHARD C. DEMARCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Lindsey D Rockers
Represented By: RICHARD C. DEMARCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT T. ROCKERS
Represented By: RICHARD C. DEMARCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDSEY D. ROCKERS
Represented By: RICHARD C. DEMARCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAVERFORD TOWNSHIP
Represented By: SUZANNE MCDONOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haverford Township Zoning Hearing Board
Represented By: SUZANNE MCDONOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?