ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY v. COMMUNITY ACTION AGENCY OF DELAWARE COUNTY, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY
Defendant: COMMUNITY ACTION AGENCY OF DELAWARE COUNTY, INC., DELAWARE COUNTY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, RICHARD CHAMBERS and RICHARD CHAMBERS doing business as RC ELECTRICAL SOLUTIONS
Case Number: 2:2022cv04400
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY re: Joseph Valentine served Summons and Complaint upon DELAWARE COUNTY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY by Personal. DELAWARE COUNTY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY served on 12/8/2022, answer due 12/29/2022. (CARFAGNO, JAMES)
December 8, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY. COMMUNITY ACTION AGENCY OF DELAWARE COUNTY, INC. waiver sent on 11/3/2022, answer due 1/2/2023. (CARFAGNO, JAMES)
November 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN R. MCNULTY on behalf of COMMUNITY ACTION AGENCY OF DELAWARE COUNTY, INC. (MCNULTY, KEVIN)
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to RICHARD CHAMBERS, COMMUNITY ACTION AGENCY OF DELAWARE COUNTY, INC., DELAWARE COUNTY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 11/3/22 (bw)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RICHARD CHAMBERS, RICHARD CHAMBERS(D/B/A RC ELECTRICAL SOLUTIONS), COMMUNITY ACTION AGENCY OF DELAWARE COUNTY, INC., DELAWARE COUNTY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16290685.), filed by ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY.(CARFAGNO, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY v. COMMUNITY ACTION AGENCY OF DELAWARE COUNTY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES P. CARFAGNO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY ACTION AGENCY OF DELAWARE COUNTY, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN R. MCNULTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELAWARE COUNTY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD CHAMBERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD CHAMBERS doing business as RC ELECTRICAL SOLUTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?