AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. v. LOHMAN
Plaintiff: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.
Defendant: MICHAEL W. LOHMAN
Case Number: 2:2022cv04453
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASES (22-CV-4452-WB & 22-CV-4453-WB) ARE CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES UNDER CASE NO. 22-CV-2837-WB AND SUBJECT TO THE CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES ESTABLISHED IN THE AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER IN THAT CASE (ECF NO.15). SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 1/3/23. 1/3/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
December 22, 2022 Filing 7 Discovery Plan by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP..(NOONE, MATTHEW)
December 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/3/2023 11:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE.COUNSEL SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE ZOOM INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov NO LATER THAN FIVE DAYS PRIOR TO CONFERENCE. (Attachments: #1 ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER, #2 JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26 F.)(amw)
December 6, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by MICHAEL W. LOHMAN.(HORNEFF, ELIZABETH)
December 6, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH A. HORNEFF on behalf of MICHAEL W. LOHMAN with Jury Demand(HORNEFF, ELIZABETH)
November 17, 2022 Filing 3 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Elizabeth Horneff, Esq. Re: accepted summons and complaint for AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. on 11/16/2022, answer due 12/7/2022. (NOONE, MATTHEW)
November 7, 2022 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including The Progressive Corporation by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP..(NOONE, MATTHEW)
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL W. LOHMAN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16298081.), filed by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form Designation Form)(NOONE, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. v. LOHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.
Represented By: MATTHEW F. NOONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL W. LOHMAN
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. HORNEFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?