JARMON v. HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. et al
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY JARMON
Defendant: HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., THE HOME DEPOT and HOME DEPOT, INC.
Case Number: 2:2022cv04474
Filed: November 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 3/16/2023 09:30 AM IN Courtroom 5C.(sah)
December 2, 2022 Filing 5 Notice Re: Arbitration Video Conference (Attachments: #1 (Consent) (aes)
November 14, 2022 Filing 4 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (ke)
November 9, 2022 Filing 3 Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt)
November 9, 2022 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including The Home Depot, Inc. by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC..(STRINGHAM, JOHN)
November 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16302038), filed by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Certificate of Service)(STRINGHAM, JOHN) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/9/2022) (sbt). (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/9/2022) (sbt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JARMON v. HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY JARMON
Represented By: KEVIN BRADWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: JOHN GRANT STRINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HOME DEPOT
Represented By: JOHN GRANT STRINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOME DEPOT, INC.
Represented By: JOHN GRANT STRINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?